Rohr et al v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:14-cv-01928
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2017 at 11:45 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Debbie Rohr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben W. Gordon, Jr. +1 850 434 0509 +1 850 436 6059 bgordon@levinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL A. NIGH +1 850 435 7013 +1 850 435 7020 dnigh@levinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S. Mann +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2711 jonm@pittmandutton.com
No Logo Jerry Rohr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben W. Gordon, Jr. +1 850 434 0509 +1 850 436 6059 bgordon@levinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL A. NIGH +1 850 435 7013 +1 850 435 7020 dnigh@levinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S. Mann +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2711 jonm@pittmandutton.com
v.
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics, Defendant
No Logo Stryker Corp. , Defendant
No Logo Stryker Ireland Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stryker Ireland Limited"
No Logo Stryker Sales Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT IN CERTAIN MEMBER CASES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (TSS) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Order for Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Member Cases. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 09/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (TSS) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Member Actions by Howmedica Osteonics re: ECF No. 694 in 13-md-2441 (DWF/FLN). (TSS) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Defendant Howmedica Osteonics Corp's Request for Entry Of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Member Actions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Part 7), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 8), # 4 Exhibit B (Part 9), # 5 Exhibit B (Part 10), # 6 Exhibit B (Part 11), # 7 Exhibit B (Part 12)) (TSS) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          TEXT ONLY NOTICE - COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This Notice serves as a reminder to all counsel that they shall read and comply with all Orders and Pretrial Orders ("PTOs") filed in the In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN master MDL docket (0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN), even if not filed in the individual member cases. As the Court noted on May 28, 2014 (Doc. No. 326 ), the Court only files all new or amended Orders and Pretrial Orders that are applicable to all actions in the master MDL docket. For example, PTO No. 29, filed today on the master MDL docket is applicable to all cases and should be read and complied with by all counsel for all cases. Indeed, counsel is responsible for all documents applicable to all actions and filed in the master MDL docket. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN. Further, all Orders, minutes, notices and transcripts that are filed in the master case will also be posted on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/27/2015. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Rohr. Jerry Rohr served on 9/9/2014, answer due 9/30/2014. (Nemo, Anthony) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Rohr, Debbie Rohr. Howmedica Osteonics served on 6/19/2014, answer due 7/10/2014; Stryker Corp. served on 6/19/2014, answer due 7/10/2014; Stryker Sales Corporation served on 6/19/2014, answer due 7/10/2014. (Hellums, Christopher) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Ireland Limited, Stryker Sales Corporation. (kt) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN. Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. (kt) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per MDL List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 14-cv-1928 DWF/FLN. (kt) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corp., Stryker Ireland Limited, Stryker Sales Corporation. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4018511.) Filed by Jerry Rohr, Debbie Rohr. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hellums, Christopher) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 51 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?