JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00002
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2016 at 4:14 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Judicial Watch, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Judicial Watch, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Orfanedes +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 porfanedes@judicialwatch.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Francis Rothstein +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 drothstein@judicialwatch.org
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES. (mpt, ) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ENTERED IN ERROR..... ORDER for Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2011 09:45 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mpt, ) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES.(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed in a FOIA Case as to the U.S. Attorney for DC; DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/10/2011, answer due 2/9/2011 for U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. identifying Corporate Parent NONE for JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (dr) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616035348) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 99 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?