Cox v. Porsche Financial Services, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-23409

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2021 at 5:35 PM DT (2.4 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Steven Michael Cox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Ryan Myers +1 205 342 7896 rmyers@corywatson.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hirlye R. +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 rlutz@corywatson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank Jerome Tapley +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 jtapley@cwcd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald Weil PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Peter Weil +1 305 372 5352 +1 305 372 5355 rpw@weillaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 850

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A Schweikert +1 305 372 5352 +1 305 372 5355 mschweikert@weilquaranta.net
v.
Porsche Cars North America, Inc Porsche Cars North America, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Broad & Cassel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline Stechsculte Miller +1 561 832 3300 +6551 655 655 1109 jmiller@broadandcassel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Suzanne Pellegrino +1 561 832 3300 tpellegrino@broadandcassel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M. Byrne +1 404 853 8026 +1 404 853 8806 tom.byrne@sutherland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacey McGavin Mohr +1 404 853 8004 stacey.mohr@sutherland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie Strong Sanders +1 404 853 8000 +1 404 853 8806 valerie.sanders@sutherland.com
Porsche Financial Services, Inc. Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Broad & Cassel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline Stechsculte Miller +1 561 832 3300 +6551 655 655 1109 jmiller@broadandcassel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Suzanne Pellegrino +1 561 832 3300 tpellegrino@broadandcassel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M. Byrne +1 404 853 8026 +1 404 853 8806 tom.byrne@sutherland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacey McGavin Mohr +1 404 853 8004 stacey.mohr@sutherland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie Strong Sanders +1 404 853 8000 +1 404 853 8806 valerie.sanders@sutherland.com
No Logo Porsche Leasing Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Broad & Cassel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline Stechsculte Miller +1 561 832 3300 +6551 655 655 1109 jmiller@broadandcassel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Suzanne Pellegrino +1 561 832 3300 tpellegrino@broadandcassel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M. Byrne +1 404 853 8026 +1 404 853 8806 tom.byrne@sutherland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacey McGavin Mohr +1 404 853 8004 stacey.mohr@sutherland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie Strong Sanders +1 404 853 8000 +1 404 853 8806 valerie.sanders@sutherland.com
  Entries (168) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 10/21/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: None Approve Consent Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Amended Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/25/2021, Entered: None Hearing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Settlement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Continue
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Continue
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Appear
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Motion to Seal (Public)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None Continue
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediation
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Motion to Seal (Public)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Motion to Seal (Public)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Motion to Seal (Public)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Order pdf attached
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Motion to Seal (Public)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Motion to Seal (Public)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediation
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 10/12/2017 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - July 28th Order, # 2 Exhibit B - July 28th Discovery Hearing Transcript, # 3 Exhibit C - August 11th Order) (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Steven Michael Cox re 86 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, of Filing the Parties' Jointly Proposed Amended Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - The Parties' proposed Amended Scheduling Order) (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall move for class certification on or before November 20, 2017. Defendants shall respond on or before February 18, 2018. The parties shall file a proposed amended scheduling order reflecting the new deadlines on or before Tuesday, September 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hmo) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Class Certification and Extend Other Deadlines re 31 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Judge,,,, filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Porsche Leasing Ltd.. Replies due by 9/27/2017. (Pellegrino, Tara) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 83 by Wednesday, September 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hmo) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Class Certification and Extend Other Deadlines re 31 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Judge,,,, by Steven Michael Cox. Responses due by 9/22/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed New Deadlines, # 2 Exhibit B - Defense Counsel's August 18th Email, # 3 Exhibit C - PFS's Responses to First Request for Production, # 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs Counsels May 17th Email, # 5 Exhibit E - Defense Counsels July 13th Email, # 6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs Counsels July 14th Email, # 7 Exhibit G - Fiservs July 21st Email, # 8 Exhibit H - Plaintiff Counsels August 1st Email, # 9 Exhibit I - Defense Counsels August 28th Email, # 10 Exhibit J - PCNAs Objections to First Request for Production, # 11 Exhibit K - Defendants Counsels August 8th Email)(Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 6/22/2017 before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff, 1-25 pages, Court Reporter: Diane Miller, 561-514-3728 / Diane_Miller@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2017. (dmr) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 4/13/2017 before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff, 1-38 pages, Court Reporter: Diane Miller, 561-514-3728 / Diane_Miller@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2017. (dmr) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of discovery hearing held on 8-10-2017 before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff, 1-29 pages, Court Reporter: Dawn Savino, 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Savino@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2017. (dwh) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Motions terminated: 70 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Leasing Ltd., Porsche Financial Services, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 8/11/2017. (rms1) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 72 Notice of Hearing by Attorney filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Leasing Ltd., Porsche Financial Services, Inc., 74 Notice (Other),, filed by Steven Michael Cox, (Deadline 9/7/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 8/11/2017. (rms1) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff: Discovery Hearing held on 8/10/2017. Oral arguments heard. The Parties' respective motions are Granted-in-Part and Denied-in-Part, consistent with the Court's deadlines and instructions. Written Order to follow. Total time in court: 40 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Mark A Schweikert, Thomas M. Byrne via video conference. (Digital 14:07:21) (yar) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Steven Michael Cox re 74 Notice (Other),, Second Notice of Filing Evidence Related to Discovery Disputes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - 34 Monthly-Payment Leases Containing Virtually Identical Legal Violations as in Plaintiff's Lease) (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Steven Michael Cox re 74 Notice (Other),, of Filing Evidence Related to Discovery Disputes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 22 Monthly-Payment Leases Showing the "Swallowing" of Trade-in Equity on their Face, # 2 Exhibit B - Summary Spreadsheet of Remaining Sample of Monthly-Payment Leases) (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Steven Michael Cox re 72 Notice of Hearing by Attorney of Additional Issues for August 10th Discovery Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's counsel's email about deposition dates, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's counsel's email agreeing to pay $5,000 discovery cost, # 3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Objections to Third Request for Production, # 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Application for Certificate of Title With/Without Registration, # 5 Exhibit E - Defendants Interrogatory Answers) (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing (Transcribed from the Digital Audio Recording) held on July 28, 2017, before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff, 1-91 pages, Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards, 305-523-5499 / Lisa_Edwards@flsd.uscourts.gov. (Digital 14:13:07.) Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2017. (le) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 8/10/2017 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff. (Pellegrino, Tara) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART 60 Notice/Motion (Plaintiff's Amended Corrected Notice of Hearing filed by Steven Michael Cox Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 7/28/2017. (rms1) Modified text on 8/1/2017 (dm). (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff: Discovery Hearing held on 7/28/2017. Oral arguments heard. Plaintiff's discovery related requests are GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART consistent with the Court's instructions. Written order to follow. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 31 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Mark A Schweikert, Thomas M. Byrne, (Digital 14:13:07) (yar) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Steven Michael Cox of Filing Discovery-Related Correspondence with Magistrate Judge for Due Process Purposes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Correspondence regarding March 23rd Hearing, # 2 Exhibit B - Correspondence regarding April 13th Hearing, # 3 Exhibit C - Correspondence regarding June 22nd Hearing, # 4 Exhibit D - Correspondence regarding July 28th Hearing) (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Steven Michael Cox re 66 Response in Support of Motion,, Notice of Filing Inadvertently Omitted Exhibit F to 66 Plaintiff's Reply in Support of 60 61 his Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F to Plaintiff's 66 Reply in Support of his 60 61 Motion to Compel) (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Support re 61 MOTION to Compel to produce 22 categories of documents aka Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Response 65 for July 28th Hearing filed by Steven Michael Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Interrogatory Answers, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Lease, # 3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production, # 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Dealer Worksheet, # 5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Lease Order, # 6 Exhibit G - Email from Defendants' Vendor Estimating $5,000 Production Cost)(Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Compel to produce 22 categories of documents filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Porsche Leasing Ltd.. Replies due by 8/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Jeanette Supena, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Paula Kelly)(Pellegrino, Tara) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER denying 63 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. As set forth in the Court's 31 Scheduling Order, the parties shall not file any written discovery motions unless Judge Turnoff directs the parties to do so at his discovery calendar. If Judge Turnoff determines that additional briefing is necessary, he will order the parties to file additional briefing. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (ssd) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerks Notice to Filer re 59 Notice (Other). Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (lk) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Alternative MOTION to Compel to produce 22 categories of documents by Steven Michael Cox. Responses due by 7/31/2017. See image at DE 59 (lk) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Steven Michael Cox re 59 Notice (Other), 57 Notice (Other) CORRECTED Amended Notice of Discovery Hearing on July 28th or, Alternatively, Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Lease, # 2 Exhibit B - Dealer's Lease Recap Screen, # 3 Exhibit C - 5/9/17 Corp. Rep. Depo. Trans., # 4 Exhibit D -) (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Steven Michael Cox re 57 Notice (Other) Amended Notice of Discovery Hearing on July 28th or, Alternatively, Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Lease, # 2 Exhibit B - Lease Recap Screen, # 3 Exhibit C - Corp. Rep. Depo. Trans., # 4 Exhibit D - Application for Certificate of Title With/Without Registration) (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 7/28/2017 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff. (Pellegrino, Tara) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Steven Michael Cox of Discovery Hearing Set for July 28, 2017 (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's June 26, 2017 Order. 54 . The time for compliance is hereby extended until 7/13/2017. This entry constitutes the Paperless Order in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 7/6/2017. (mao) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff: Discovery Hearing held on 6/22/2017. Oral arguments heard. Plaintiff's discovery related requests are GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART, consistent with this Court's instructions and rulings. Written Order to follow. Total time in court: 25 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Ronald Peter Weil, present on behalf of the Plaintiff. Mark A Schweikert, and Thomas M. Byrne, present on behalf of the Defendants. (Digital 14:11:54) (yar) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Steven Michael Cox of Discovery Hearing Set for June 22, 2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Keith Kravitz) (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Reconvened Discovery Hearing held on 5/12/2017 before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff, 1-37 pages, Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(amb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff: Reconvened Discovery hearing held on 5/12/2017 re 43 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Supporting Memorandum filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Leasing Ltd., Porsche Financial Services, Inc. Oral arguments heard. DE 43 Motion For Protective Order: Granted-in-Part and Denied-in-Part, consistent with this Court's instructions and rulings. Written order to follow. Total time in court: 40 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Mark A Schweikert, Esq., and Ronald Peter Weil, Esq., present on behalf of the Plaintiff. Thomas M. Byrne, Esq., present on behalf of the Defendant. (Digital 14:16:06) (yar) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 43 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Supporting Memorandum filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Porsche Leasing Ltd.. (Pellegrino, Tara) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Supporting Memorandum filed by Steven Michael Cox. Replies due by 5/19/2017. (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 45 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Judge. Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 17-cv-20209-Scola. (lk) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order entered in error. Text Modified on 4/25/2017 (lk). (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 43 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Supporting Memorandum :( Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2017 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff.). This entry constitutes the Paperless Order in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 4/25/2017.(mao) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing, as two different attorney names are contained in the Motion. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (ssd) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff: Discovery Hearing held on 4/13/2017. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Thomas M. Byrne, Mark A Schweikert, Ronald Peter Weil. (Digital 15:37:23) (ra) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER granting 37 Motion to Continue. Discovery Hearing is hereby reset for 4/13/2017 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff. This entry constitutes the Paperless Order in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 3/23/2017. (mao) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER denying Plaintiff's Alabama counsel's 35 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Local counsel shall be prepared to argue, in person, at the March 23, 2017 Discovery Conference. This entry constitutes the Paperless Order in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 3/22/2017. (mao) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 3/23/2017 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff. (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Hirlye R. "Ryan" Lutz, III is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Lutz at rlutz@corywatson.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (ssd) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Steven Michael Cox of Filing the Parties' Second Jointly Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Proposed Scheduling Order) (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Darrin P. Gayles: Status Conference held on 1/4/2017. Attorneys for both sides present. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Parties shall submit their revised Joint Scheduling Report on or before 1/6/2017. Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ssd) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion for Permission to Appear by Telephone. Counsel may enter their appearances telephonically at the Status Conference set for 1/4/2017 at 9:30 AM using the following dial-in information: Dial-in Number 888-273-3658; Access Code 7032614; Security Code 5170. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the Status Conference begins and wait until your case is called. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (ssd) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER Setting Status Conference. Status Conference Re: Scheduling/Deadlines/Procedural Matters set for 1/4/2017 at 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (ssd) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Steven Michael Cox (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Porsche Leasing Ltd.. (Miller, Jacqueline) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Porsche Financial Services, Inc.. (Miller, Jacqueline) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Miller, Jacqueline) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/25/2016. (ssd) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Valerie S. Sanders is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendants Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Porsche Leasing Ltd., and Porsche Cars North America, Inc. for all purposes relating to this action. The Clerk is directed to provided Notice of Electronic Filings to Ms. Sanders at valerie.sanders@sutherland.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/19/2016. (ssd) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Stacey M. Mohr is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendants Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Porsche Leasing Ltd., and Porsche Cars North America, Inc. for all purposes relating to this action. The Clerk is directed to provided Notice of Electronic Filings to Ms. Mohr at stacey.mohr@sutherland.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/19/2016. (ssd) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Thomas M. Byrne is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendants Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Porsche Leasing Ltd., and Porsche Cars North America, Inc. for all purposes relating to this action. The Clerk is directed to provided Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Byrne at tom.byrne@sutherland.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/19/2016. (ssd) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before October 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/18/2016. (ssd) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Porsche Leasing Ltd. (Miller, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Steven Michael Cox. Porsche Financial Services, Inc. served on 9/20/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Steven Michael Cox. Porsche Cars North America, Inc. served on 9/20/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Steven Michael Cox. Porsche Leasing Ltd. served on 9/20/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. (Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/15/2016. (ahk) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank Jerome Tapley on behalf of Steven Michael Cox. Attorney Frank Jerome Tapley added to party Steven Michael Cox(pty:pla). (Tapley, Frank) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lrz) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (lrz) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lrz) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8985398, filed by Steven Michael Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E)(Schweikert, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?