Cecilia Acosta v. Ursula Lenhart Revocable Livin, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 16-15820

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 11:07 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109196178 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Cecilia Acosta. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109169811 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gregory Gillis Olsen for Ursula Lenhart Revocable Living Trust Dated August 6, 2012 and The Estate of Ursula Lehnart. (ECF: Gregory Olsen)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109162233 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wendy Jill Stein for Joseph L. Schneider. (ECF: Wendy Stein)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109156768 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Cecilia Acosta on 09/01/2016. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/12/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 09/23/2016 as to Appellant Cecilia Acosta
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 104 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?