Powell Jr., et al v. IRS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:89-cv-00182-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Clayton J. Powell, Jr., Plaintiff
No Logo Darlene W. Powell, Plaintiff
v.
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/19/1989
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Prince George's
Terminated 3/18/1992
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 8/10/1992, Entered: 8/11/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL, Ordered that this case is DISMISSED as moot, that each party will bear his/her/its own costs.( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (microfilmed 7/11/92) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 8/5/1992, Entered: 8/5/1992 USCA Mandate
    JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "REMANDING" the case to the District Court for dismissal as moot. (c/s). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 5/15/1992, Entered: 5/19/1992 Order
      ORDER (copy) of the U.S. Court of Appeals, for the Fourth Circuit, "DENYING" Petition for rehearing en banc; and "DENYING" Petition for rehearing, as therein more particularly set forth. (jmk, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 3/18/1992, Entered: 3/23/1992 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) dated March 16, 1992 "RESCINDING" the Order of February 27, 1992 dismissing the case without prejudice; and "DISMISSING" this case as moot. (c/m 3/17/92 jw) (microfilmed 3/23/92) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/18/1992, Entered: 3/23/1992 Terminated Case
          Case closed (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 3/2/1992, Entered: 3/3/1992 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER dated 2/27/92, "DISMISSING" case without prejudice, any party wishing to reopen case shall file a motion to this effect by April 3, 1992 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis )(c/m 2/29/92 chambers)MICROFILMED 3/3/92 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/17/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 Remark
              Reassignment Letter mailed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/31/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 Remark
                Record on Appeal transmitted to Clerk, U.S. Court of Appeals, for the Fourth Circuit, Richmond, Virginia (Volume I) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 8/28/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 Designation of Record on Appeal
                  DESIGNATION by Clayton J. Powell Jr., Darlene W. Powell of record on appeal (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 8/14/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) retaining record for use in ongoing litigation except plaintiffs' notice of appeal; any transcripts may be ordered for purposes of appeal; copy of this order; docket entries and copies of such pleadings as the parties may designate which will be transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals as therein set forth. (c/m 8/15/89akc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 7/31/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 Remark
                      Copy of Docketing Statement of Plaintiffs and attachments. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 7/14/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER denying [18-1] motion for Reconsideration ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 7/14/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991, Terminated: 7/14/1989 Motion for Reconsideration
                          MOTION by Clayton J. Powell Jr., Darlene W. Powell for Reconsideration and attachments. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 7/14/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 Notice of Appeal
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Clayton J. Powell Jr., Darlene W. Powell . Fee Status: pd Appeal record due on 8/14/89 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/13/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to IRS 5/3/89 (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/16/1991
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 7/7/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                MARGINAL ORDER ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) "DENYING" Motion of Plaintiffs for Immediate Hearing as therein more particularily set forth and attachments. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 7/7/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) "DENYING" Motion of Plaintiff for immediate hearing. (c/m by chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/28/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to IRS 4/17/89 and attachment. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 4/28/1989, Entered: 10/12/1991 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                      MEMORANDUM by Clayton J. Powell Jr., Darlene W. Powell in opposition to Motion of Defendant to Dismiss. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 4/25/1989, Entered: 9/22/1991 Summons Issued
                                        Third SUMMONS(ES) issued as to AG (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/21/1989, Entered: 9/22/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                          Motion and ORDER "Granting" plaintiff leave for third summons to be issued. (c/m by chambers) ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/11/1989, Entered: 9/22/1991 Summons Issued
                                            Second SUMMONS(ES) issued as to AG and USA (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/10/1989, Entered: 9/22/1991 Remark
                                              Request of plaintiff to reissue service (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 4/7/1989, Entered: 9/22/1991 Remark
                                                Letter (Smalkin, J) "Granting" plaintiff 60 days from date of this letter to accomplish service upon IRS. (c/m by chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/7/1989, Entered: 9/22/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  Marginal ORDER denying [5-1] motion for Summary Judgment as prematurely filed. (c/m by chambers) ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 3/17/1989, Entered: 9/22/1991, Terminated: 4/7/1989 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Clayton J. Powell Jr., Darlene W. Powell for Summary Judgment (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/24/1989, Entered: 9/22/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to IRS 2/8/89 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/26/1989, Entered: 9/22/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        Motion and ORDER "Denying" request of plaintiffs for immediate hearing as therein set forth. (c/m by chambers) ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/25/1989, Entered: 9/22/1991 Summons Issued
                                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued for IRS (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/19/1989, Entered: 9/22/1991 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT, affidavits and request for immediate hearing filed; FILING FEE $ 120 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Space Space

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?