In Re Tesla Motors, Inc. Stockholder Litigation
State Civil Lawsuit Delaware Court of Chancery, Case No. 12711-VCS
Vice Chancellor Judge Joseph R. Slights III, presiding

Tags

Reality Check: Tesla, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 7, 2020 article Reality Check: Tesla, Inc..

Last Updated October 18, 2019 at 1:34 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Prickett Jones & Elliott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel L Closic

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space P. Bradford deLeeuw +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567
Space Carmella P. Keener +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567 CKeener@rmgglaw.com
Space Jessica Zeldin +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567 jzeldin@rmgglaw.com
No Logo Boston Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Prickett Jones & Elliott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel L Closic
No Logo City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space P. Bradford deLeeuw +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567
Space Carmella P. Keener +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567 CKeener@rmgglaw.com
Space Jessica Zeldin +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567 jzeldin@rmgglaw.com
No Logo Diwana, Pyare, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399
No Logo Erste Sparinvest Kapitalanlagegesellschaft MBH, Plaintiff
No Logo KBC Asset Management NV, Plaintiff
Unknown Role, KBC Group NV
Unknown Role, KBC Bank, NV
No Logo Nguyen, Nam T., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399
No Logo Oklahoma Firefighers Pension & Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vivek Upadhya +1 302 622 7000 +1 302 622 7100
No Logo Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
Space Christine Mackintosh
Space Kelly Tucker

Toggle Switch Represented by Sabella, James - Grant & Eisenhofer PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Sabella
No Logo Prasinos, Ellen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Zeldin +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567 jzeldin@rmgglaw.com
No Logo Rocke, Aaron, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Prickett Jones & Elliott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel L Closic
No Logo Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedlander & Gorris, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel E Friedlander
Space Jeffrey M Gorris +1 302 573 3508 +1 302 573 3501

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christine Mackintosh
Space Vivek Upadhya +1 302 622 7000 +1 302 622 7100

Toggle Switch Represented by Sabella, James - Grant & Eisenhofer PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Sabella
No Logo Rovelli, Felix, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
No Logo Stephens, P Evan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Biggs & Battaglia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert D. Goldberg +1 302 655 9677 +1 302 655 7924 goldberg@batlaw.com
No Logo Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity Fund USA, Plaintiff
No Logo Wolf, Thomas J, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399
v.
No Logo Gracias, Antonio J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Gracias, Tntonio J"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evan Ross +1 302 576 1600 +1 302 576 1100 dross@seitzross.com
No Logo Buss, Brad W, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cafepress.com, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
Unknown Role, Cavium Networks
Unknown Role, Aecom Technology Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evan Ross +1 302 576 1600 +1 302 576 1100 dross@seitzross.com
No Logo D Subsidiary, Inc., Defendant
Denholm, Robyn M. Denholm, Robyn M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robyn M. Denholm"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Sun Microsystems, Inc. Unknown Role, Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Echelon Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evan Ross +1 302 576 1600 +1 302 576 1100 dross@seitzross.com
Ehrenpreis, Ira Matthew Ehrenpreis, Ira Matthew, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ira Ehrenpreis"
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evan Ross +1 302 576 1600 +1 302 576 1100 dross@seitzross.com
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Musk, Elon"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Z Grossberg
Space Garrett Barak Moritz +1 302 576 1600 gmoritz@seitzross.com
Space David Evan Ross +1 302 576 1600 +1 302 576 1100 dross@seitzross.com
No Logo Evercore Group LLC, Defendant
No Logo Fisher, John HN, Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs Group Inc"
Straubel, Jeffrey Brian Straubel, Jeffrey Brian, Defendant
Officially listed as "Straubel, Jeffrey B"
Jurvetson, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Stephen T., Defendant
Officially listed as "Steve Jurvetson"
Unknown Role, Athenahealth, Inc.
Unknown Role, Draper Associates, LP
Unknown Role, Draper Timothy C
Unknown Role, Fisher John H N
Unknown Role, Enernoc, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Neophotonics Corp
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evan Ross +1 302 576 1600 +1 302 576 1100 dross@seitzross.com
Musk, Kimbal J. Musk, Kimbal J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Musk, Kimbal"
Unknown Role, Big Green
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evan Ross +1 302 576 1600 +1 302 576 1100 dross@seitzross.com
Rive, Lyndon Robert Rive, Lyndon Robert, Defendant
Officially listed as "Rive, Lyndon"
No Logo Rive, Peter Joshua, Defendant
Officially listed as "Rive, Peter J"
SolarCity Corporation SolarCity Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Solarcity Corp"
SolarCity, Inc. SolarCity, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diwana, Pyare, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmella P. Keener +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567 CKeener@rmgglaw.com
No Logo Nguyen, Nam T., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmella P. Keener +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567 CKeener@rmgglaw.com
No Logo Pfund, Nancy E., Interested Party
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Prasinos, Ellen, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space P. Bradford deLeeuw +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567
No Logo Schiffrin, Daniel, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooch & Taylor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Blake Bennett
Space Exploration Technologies Corporation Space Exploration Technologies Corporation, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Lewis Burns +1 302 651 7618 burns@rlf.com
Space Rudolf Koch +1 302 651 7721 koch@rlf.com
Space John M OToole
No Logo Stephens, P Evan, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmella P. Keener +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567 CKeener@rmgglaw.com
No Logo Stichting Blue Sky Active Large Cap Equity USA Fund, Interested Party
Think Computer Foundation Think Computer Foundation, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Klein LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia Bettina Klein
No Logo Wolf, Thomas, Interested Party
Unknown Role, Rackspace Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmella P. Keener +1 302 656 4433 +1 302 658 7567 CKeener@rmgglaw.com
No Logo New Castle County, Sheriff, Sheriff

Toggle Switch Represented by New Castle County DE Sheriffs Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheriff New Castle County
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Nominal Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by POTTER ANDERSON & CORROON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Berton W Ashman Jr
Space Jaclyn Levy
Space Kevin R Shannon
Space Seth Tangman
  Entries (439) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 439 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Order
Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of Seth R. Tangman)
    Blank 438 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Motion
    Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of Seth R. Tangman on Behalf of Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. With Certificate of Service
      Legal Document 437 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Letter dated January 25, 2021, from VC Slights to counsel rescheduling trial from March 29-April 12, 2021 to July 12-23, 2021, commencing each day at 9:15 a.m., in Wilmington
        Blank 436 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Official Transcript
        Transcript of August 17, 2020, Telephonic Settlement Hearing and Rulings of the Court
          Blank 435 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Judicial Action Form
          Judicial Action Form-Telephonic Settlement Hearing held 08.17.2020. VC Slights. Debi Donnelly, Court Reporter. Partial Settlement approved.
            Legal Document 434 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Order
            Order and Partial Final Judgment, entered by Vice Chancellor Slights on August 17, 2020
              Legal Document 433 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Reply Brief
              Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Partial Settlement and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees Reimbursement of Expenses
                Legal Document 432 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Public Version
                PUBLIC VERSION Settling Defendants' Brief in Response to Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Partial Settlement (with Certificate of Service)
                  Blank 431 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Brief
                  Settling Defendants' Brief in Response to Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Partial Settlement [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                    Legal Document 430 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Public Version
                    Public Version of Plaintiffs’ Brief in Support of Partial Settlement and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses
                      Blank 429 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Letter
                      Letter to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights from Christine M. Mackintosh enclosing courtesy copies of [CONFIDENTIAL] Plaintiffs’ Brief in Support of Partial Settlement and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses
                        Blank 428 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                        Declaration of Roger Laduke in Support of Proposed Settlement and pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 23.1
                          Blank 427 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                          Certificate of Service to Declarations in Support of [CONFIDENTIAL] Plaintiffs’ Brief in Support of Partial Settlement and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses
                            Blank 426 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                            Declaration of Kevin H. Davenport in Support of [CONFIDENTIAL] Plaintiffs’ Brief in Support of Partial Settlement and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses
                              Blank 425 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                              Declaration of Lee D. Rudy in Support of [CONFIDENTIAL] Plaintiffs’ Brief in Support of Partial Settlement and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses
                                Blank 424 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                Declaration of Christine M. Mackintosh in Support of [CONFIDENTIAL] Plaintiffs’ Brief in Support of Partial Settlement and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses
                                  Blank 423 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                  Declaration of Maxwell R. Huffman in Support of [CONFIDENTIAL] Plaintiffs’ Brief in Support of Partial Settlement and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses
                                    Blank 422 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                    [CONFIDENTIAL] Plaintiffs’ Brief in Support of Partial Settlement and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses
                                      Blank 421 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                      Letter dated July 16, 2020, from VC Slights to counsel rescheduling the 10-day trial from July 27-August 7, 2020, to March 29-April 1; April 5-9; and April 12, 2021
                                        Blank 420 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None
                                        Letter dated June 30, 2020, from VC Slights to counsel modifying the trial schedule
                                          Blank 419 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None
                                          Letter dated June 30, 2020, from VC Slights to counsel scheduling a status teleconference for July 13, 2020, at 3:00 p.m.
                                            Blank 418 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None
                                            Transcript of 6.15.20 Telephonic Status Conference
                                              Blank 417 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None
                                              Judicial Action Form-Tele Conf Status held 06.15.2020. VC Slights. Juli LaBadia, Court Reporter. Possible procedures for handling a trial under Phase 2 or Phase 3 restrictions were discussed. Counsel propose that the first week of trial be in person and the remaining trial days be held via videoconferencing. Ms. Pusey will schedule a follow up call in the next few weeks. See Transcript.
                                                Blank 416 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None
                                                Letter from Christine M. Mackintosh to the Honorable Joseph R. Slight, III enclosing copies of the Stipulation and Agreement of Compromise and Settlement between Plaintiffs and the Settling Defendants and its exhibits
                                                  Blank 415 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None
                                                  Scheduling Order entered by Vice Chancellor Slights on June 4, 2020 concerning the Settlement Hearing, scheduled for August 17, 2020, between Plaintiffs and the Settling Defendants
                                                    Blank 414 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                    Stipulation and Agreement of Compromise and Settlement between Plaintiffs and the Settling Defendants
                                                      Blank 413 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None
                                                      3-9-2020 TELECONFERENCE RE MOTIONS FOR CONTINUED CONFIDENTIALITY OF CERTAIN MATERIALS
                                                        Blank 412 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None
                                                        Letter dated April 23, 2020, from VC Slights to counsel rescheduling trial for July 27-August 7, 2020
                                                          Legal Document 411 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                          Certificate of Service to REVISED PUBLIC VERSIONS of Exhibits 19 and 70 to the Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Z. Grossberg in Support of the Director Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56, and Exhibits 3, 9, 10, 13, 69, 103, 105, and 108 to Plaintiffs' Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                            Legal Document 410 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                            REVISED PUBLIC VERSION of Exhibit 19 to Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Z. Grossberg in Support of the Director Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56
                                                            Legal Document 409 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                            Revised Public Version of Exhibit 8 to Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Grossberg in Support of the Director Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                            Legal Document 408 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                            Revised Public Version of Exhibit 6 to Plaintiffs’ Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                            Legal Document 407 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                            Letter from John M. O'Toole, Esq. to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III regarding revised public exhibits.
                                                              Legal Document 406 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                              REVISED PUBLIC VERSION - Exhibit 7 to Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                              Legal Document 405 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None
                                                              3-9-20 TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
                                                                Legal Document 404 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None
                                                                Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' and Non-Parties' Motions for Continued Confidential Treatment)
                                                                  Legal Document 403 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None
                                                                  Letter from Benjamin Z. Grossberg to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III enclosing [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' and Non-Parties' Motions for Continued Confidential Treatment
                                                                  Legal Document 402 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None
                                                                  Letter dated March 13, 2020, from VC Slights to counsel continuing trial scheduled for March 16-27, 2020.
                                                                    Blank 401 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None
                                                                    Granted with Modifications (Stipulated [Proposed] Joint Pre-Trial Order)
                                                                      Blank 400 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None
                                                                      Telephonic pre-trial conference held with VC Slights 3.9.2020. A Rule 15b motion required if complaint needs to be amended. Order of examination of witnesses will follow traditional approach. Deposition testimony will follow Rule 32. The use of witness binders is encouraged. Default rule for demonstratives: should be exchanged by 9 AM the day before. After post-trial a letter should be sent to the Court listing all exhibits mentioned pre-trial, during trial, and post-trial.
                                                                        Blank 399 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Kelly L. Tucker, Esquire enclosing courtesy copies of Stipulated [Proposed] Joint Pre-Trial Order and Exhibits
                                                                          Blank 398 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                                          Stipulated [Proposed] Joint Pre-Trial Order
                                                                          Legal Document 397 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None
                                                                          PUBLIC VERSION of Defendant's Pretrial Brief (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                            Legal Document 396 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None
                                                                            Plaintiffs' Pre-Trial Brief (Public Version)
                                                                            Legal Document 395 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None
                                                                            1-24-2020 TELECONFERENCE RE PARTIAL STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND SEVERANCE
                                                                              Blank 394 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None
                                                                              Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Severing Claims Against Certain Defendants)
                                                                                Blank 393 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                Granted (Spiro, Alexander B.: [Proposed] Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk)
                                                                                  Blank 392 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                  Spiro, Alexander B.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                    Blank 391 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Kelly L. Tucker, Esquire enclosing courtesy copies of Plaintiffs' Pre-Trial Brief
                                                                                      Blank 390 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                      Defendant's Pretrial Brief [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                        Blank 389 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Pre-Trial Brief [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                          Blank 388 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Kelly L. Tucker, Esq. enclosing Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Severing Claims Against Certain Defendants
                                                                                            Blank 387 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                            Letter dated February 20, 2020, from VC Slights to counsel concerning trial, the pretrial teleconference, and telephonic argument on the Motions for Continued Confidential Treatment
                                                                                              Blank 386 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Jeffrey Munson with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                Legal Document 385 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                Memorandum Opinion issued by Vice Chancellor Slights on February 4, 2020 on the parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                  Blank 384 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Letter from Christine M. Mackintosh to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III addressing impact of Partial Settlement relating to pending Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Upcoming Trial
                                                                                                    Blank 383 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Garrett B. Moritz addressing whether the Partial Settlement affects the Parties’ currently pending Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and the Upcoming Trial
                                                                                                      Blank 382 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Telephonic Status Conference held with VC Slights 1.24.2020 re: progress of Stipulated Partial Settlement and Severance of Def. Musk.
                                                                                                        Blank 381 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Christine Mackintosh, Esquire regarding Settlement with Certain Defendants and Request for a Status Conference
                                                                                                          Blank 380 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Steve Jurvetson with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                            Blank 379 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Exhibits 137 through 151 to Co-Lead Plaintiffs Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment [Public]
                                                                                                              Blank 378 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Defendants' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                Blank 377 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                The SolarCity Third Parties' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment
                                                                                                                  Blank 376 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Non-Party Space Exploration Technologies Corp.'s Reply in Further Support of its Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment
                                                                                                                    Blank 375 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Granted (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING INADVERTENTLY PUBLICLY FILED EXHIBITS TO THE APPENDIX OF DOCUMENTS CITED IN CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS' OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
                                                                                                                      Blank 374 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING INADVERTENTLY PUBLICLY FILED EXHIBITS TO THE APPENDIX OF DOCUMENTS CITED IN CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS' OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                        Blank 373 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal of Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents from the Custodial Files of their Trial Witnesses with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                          Blank 372 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Letter dated December 19, 2019, from VC Slights to counsel requesting replies in further support of the Motions for Continued Confidential Treatment
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 371 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Think Computer Foundation's Omnibus Response to Motions for Continued Confidential Treatment
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 370 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing Schedule on Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents from the Custodial Files of their Trial Witnesses)
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 369 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing Schedule on Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents from the Custodial Files of their Trial Witnesses
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 368 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Granted ([Proposed] Order re: Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund Motion to Withdraw the Appearances of Carmella P. Keener, Jessica Zeldin and P. Bradford deLeeuw)
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 367 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund Motion to Withdraw the Appearances of Carmella P. Keener, Jessica Zeldin and P. Bradford deLeeuw
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 366 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Letter from Kelly L. Tucker to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III requesting scheduling conference regarding briefing schedule for Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents from the Custodial Files of Their Trial Witnesses
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 365 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Non-Party Space Exploration Technologies Corp.'s Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment
                                                                                                                                    Blank 364 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents from the Custodial Files of their Trial Witnesses with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 363 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Letter to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III Enclosing Courtesy Copies of non-party Space Exploration Technologies Corporation’s Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment, and accompanying papers filed November 27, 2019
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 362 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Letter to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Lori W. Will Enclosing Copies of The SolarCity Third Parties' Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment and Accompanying Documents
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 361 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Lori W. Will Regarding Amended Confidential Exhibits B-2 through J-2 to the SolarCity Third Parties' Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment
                                                                                                                                          Blank 360 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Garrett B. Moritz enclosing two courtesy copies of (i) Defendants’ Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment and (ii) Transmittal Affidavit of Garrett B. Moritz in Support of Defendants’ Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment which were filed with the Court on Wednesday, November 27, 2019.
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 359 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Defendants' Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 358 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            The SolarCity Third Parties' Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 357 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Letter from Julia B. Klein (DE 5198) to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III Regarding Notice of Challenge to Omissions of Material from Public Versions of Pleadings
                                                                                                                                              Blank 356 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              [CONFIDENTIAL] Non-Party Space Exploration Technologies Corp.'s Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 355 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Letter from Julia B. Klein (DE 5198) to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III Regarding Notice of Challenge to Omissions of Material from Public Versions of Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                Blank 354 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Entry of Appearance of Bradley D. Sorrels, Lori W. Will and Leah E. Brenner on behalf of Interested Parties Draper Fisher Jurvetson, Donald R. Kendall, Lyndon Rive, Peter Rive, Nancy Pfund, and DBL Partners
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 353 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Julia B. Klein (DE 5198) to the Honorable Vice Chancellor Slights Regarding Think Computer Foundation's Notice of Challenge to Omissions of Material from Public Versions of Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 352 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    11-4-19 ORAL ARGUMENT ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 351 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Notice and Certificate of Service of the (i) Defendants' Identification of Trial Witnesses; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 350 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Granted (Gruenstein, Benjamin: [Proposed] Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 349 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz as Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Director Defendants)
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 348 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Think Computer Foundation Notice of Challenge of Omission of Material)
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 347 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Withdraw Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz as Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Director Defendants (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 346 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Think Computer Foundation Notice of Challenge of Omission of Material
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 345 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice by Think Computer Foundation of Challenge of Omission of Material from Public Versions of Pleadings Pursuant to Ch. Ct. R. 5.1(f) (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 344 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Oral Argument on motion for Sum. judgment held before VC Slights 11.4.2019. Decision is under advisement. See Transcript. Parties were advised to prepare for Trial in March.
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 343 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Gruenstein, Benjamin: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 342 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service to the Public Version of Corrected Exhibit 160 to Plaintiffs' Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 341 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Public Version of Corrected Exhibit 160 to Plaintiffs' Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 340 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Kelly L. Tucker to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III regarding Plaintiffs' Exhibit 160 to Plaintiffs' Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 339 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION OF Plaintiffs' Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 338 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION Exhibits 40 - 46 to Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Z. Grossberg in Support of the Director Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 337 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION Exhibits 19 - 21 to Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Z. Grossberg in Support of the Director Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 336 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION Exhibit 8 to Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Z. Grossberg in Support of the Director Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 335 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION of Plaintiffs’ Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 334 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION of Plaintiffs’ Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 333 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION of Plaintiffs’ Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 332 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION of Plaintiffs’ Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 331 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION of Plaintiffs’ Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 330 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION of Plaintiffs’ Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 329 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION of Plaintiffs’ Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 328 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION of Plaintiffs’ Corrected Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 327 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION - Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Further Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 326 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLIC VERSION Director Defendants' Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56 (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 325 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Director Defendants' Notice of Depositions of Murray M. Beach, Juergen Moessner, and Ronald G. Quintero (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 324 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Kelly L. Tucker to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III forward courtesy copies of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and supporting documents
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 323 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      The Director Defendants' Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56 [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 322 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Notice of Expert Depositions with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 321 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Further Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 320 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLIC VERSION of Plaintiffs' Answering Brief in Opposition to Director Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 319 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLIC VERSION Director Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 318 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice and Certificate of Service of the (i) Expert Rebuttal Report of Daniel R. Fischel, dated September 26, 2019; (ii) Expert Rebuttal Report of Frederick G. Van Zijl, dated September 26, 2019; and (iii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 317 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Kelly L. Tucker to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III Forwarding Courtesy Copies of Plaintiffs' Answering Brief in Opposition to Director Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 316 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibits 79-80 to the Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Z. Grossberg [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 315 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Director Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 314 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Appendix of Documents Cited in Plaintiffs' Answering Brief in Opposition to Director Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [FILED UNDER SEAL] with certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 313 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Answering Brief in Opposition to Director Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 312 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of Appearance of Seth R. Tangman on behalf of Nominal Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc., and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 311 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 310 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Kelly L. Tucker to Kenneth J. Lagowski, Register in Chancery, regarding the unsealing of Plaintiffs' Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 309 Filed: 9/22/2019, Entered: 9/22/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 308 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Think Computer Foundation's Notice of Challenge of Confidential Treatment (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 307 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of Appearance of Julia B. Klein of Klein LLC on Behalf of Think Computer Foundation for the Limited Purpose of Challenging Confidential Treatment of Certain Filings (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 306 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Granted (Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of Jay G. Stirling on behalf of Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 305 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Notice of Challenge to Confidential Treatment of Plaintiffs' Opening Brief in support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 304 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of Jay G. Stirling on behalf of Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc., with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 303 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) The Director Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Designations and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 302 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PUBLIC VERSION Plaintiffs' Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 301 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLIC VERSION of The Director Defendants’ Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56 (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 300 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Kelly L. Tucker to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III forwarding courtesy copies of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Proposed Order, Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Appendix of Documents Cited in Opening Brief and 3 flash drives
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 299 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' CORRECTED Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 298 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 297 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 72 to Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Z. Grossberg in Support of the Director Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 296 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibits 39-46 to Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Z. Grossberg in Support of the Director Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56 [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 295 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit 24 to Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Z. Grossberg in Support of the Director Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56 [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 294 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs’ Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 293 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs’ Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 292 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 291 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 290 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 289 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibits 15-19 to Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Z. Grossberg in Support of the Director Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56 [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 288 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 287 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 286 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The Director Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court of Chancery Rule 56
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 285 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Appendix of Documents Cited in their Opening Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 284 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice and Certificate of Service of the (i) Expert Report of Daniel R. Fischel, dated August 26, 2019; (ii) Expert Report of Jonathan F. Foster, dated August 26, 2019; (iii) Expert Report of Dan Reicher, dated August 26, 2019; and (iv) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 283 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Second Amended Notice of Continued Deposition of Elon Musk with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 282 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Continued Deposition of Elon Musk with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 281 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: 7/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) The Director Defendants' Expert Designations and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 280 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Notice of Continued Deposition of Elon Musk with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 279 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: 7/11/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Order Governing Expert Discovery)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 278 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Letter to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III regarding competing Proposed Order Governing Expert Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 277 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to J. Stuart Francis with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 276 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted (Lavely, Vanessa A.: [Proposed] Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 275 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Lavely, Vanessa A.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 274 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Amended Case Schedule)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 273 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Amended Case Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 272 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Service of Tesla's Responses and Objections to Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories Directed to Tesla, Inc., and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 271 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Hayden Barnard and Jason Wheeler with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 270 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: 5/30/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted (Outwater, Alex M.: [Proposed] Order Granting Pro Hac Vice admission on behalf of Plaintiffs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 269 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Depositions of Elon Musk and Brad Buss with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 268 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Outwater, Alex M.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 267 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Courtney McBean and Stuart Francis with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 266 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Evercore Group L.L.C. with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 265 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Jeffrey B. Straubel with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 264 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Defendant Elon Musk's Responses and Objections to Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 263 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to John H.N. Fisher with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 262 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Jeff Evanson with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 261 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Radford Small with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 260 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted (Botnick, Claire: [Proposed] Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 259 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Botnick, Claire: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 258 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Jeffrey B. Straubel with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 257 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Jon McNeill with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 256 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoenas Ad Testificandum Directed to J. Stuart Francis, Courtney McBean, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP and KPMG LLP with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 255 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Steve Jurvetson with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 254 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Service of 1) Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories Directed to Tesla, Inc. and 2) this Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 253 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLIC VERSION: Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 252 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Jason Wheeler with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 251 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of Appearance of Vivek Upadhya on behalf of Plaintiffs Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, and Felix Rovelli with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 250 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Public Version of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 249 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Nancy Pfund with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 248 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 247 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (Camp, Marshall A.: Proposed Order Regarding Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on the behalf of Non-Party Space Exploration Technologies Corporation)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 246 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted (Williams, Jenna: Proposed Order Regarding Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on the behalf of Non-Party Space Exploration Technologies Corporation)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 245 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Marshall Camp on the behalf of Non-Party Space Exploration Technologies Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 244 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Jenna Williams on the behalf of Non-Party Space Exploration Technologies Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 243 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Kelly L. Tucker, Esquire Enclosing Courtesy Copies of 1) Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of its Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents and 2) Supplemental Transmittal Affidavit of Kelly L. Tucker, with all exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 242 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [FILED UNDER SEAL] Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 241 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III Enclosing Courtesy Copies of non-party Space Exploration Technologies Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 240 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transmittal Affidavit of John M. O'Toole, Esq. in support of Space Exploration Technologies Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 239 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum ( Confidential Filing )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 238 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted (Miller, Lynn: Proposed Order granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 237 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Toby Corey (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 236 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/23/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lynn Miller on behalf of Nominal Defendant Tesla Inc., and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 235 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: 4/19/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Toby Corey, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 234 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Granted ([Proposed] Stipulated Order of Class Certification)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 233 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [Proposed] Stipulated Order of Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 232 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Notice of Amended Deposition of Kimbal Musk, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 231 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 230 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 229 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLIC VERSION: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 228 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Service of (1) Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant Elon Musk; and (2) this Notice of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 227 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Notice of Depositions of Kimbal Musk, Donald R. Kendall, Jr., Ira Ehrenpreis, Lazard Frères & Co. LLC, Tobey Corey, Hayes Barnard, and Tanguy Serra, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 226 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance of Rudolf Koch, Robert L. Burns, and John M. O'Toole of Richards, Layton & Finger, P. A. as counsel to non-party Space Exploration Technologies Corporation (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 225 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum, with certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 224 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [FILED UNDER SEAL] Exhibits Q through Y to Transmittal Affidavit of Kelly L. Tucker in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 223 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [FILED UNDER SEAL] Exhibit O to Transmittal Affidavit of Kelly L. Tucker in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 222 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [FILED UNDER SEAL] Exhibits F through I to Transmittal Affidavit of Kelly L. Tucker in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 221 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [FILED UNDER SEAL] Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Space Exploration Technologies Corporation to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 220 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Directed to KPMG LLP and PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 219 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 218 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Notice of Depositions of Peter Rive, Lyndon Rive, Nancy Pfund, and John H.N. Fisher, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 217 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service to the Public Version of the Opening Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 216 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLIC VERSION: Opening Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 215 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (Gebremariam, Helam: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 214 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted (Slifkin, Daniel: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 213 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Granted (Chesler, Evan R.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 212 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Gebremariam, Helam: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 211 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Slifkin, Daniel: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 210 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Chesler, Evan R.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 209 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Notice of Depositions of Kimbal Musk, Antonio J. Gracias, Brad Buss, Steve Jurvetson, Elon Musk, and Robyn Denholm, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 208 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice and Certificate of Service of the Verifications of Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias and Kimbal Musk to Responses and Objections To Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Set Of Interrogatories; and this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 207 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: 3/18/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice and Certificate of Service of Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk's Responses and Objections To Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Set Of Interrogatories; and this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 206 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: 3/18/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Planitiffs' Motion for Class Certification, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 205 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to non-party Toby Corey (pursuant to Delaware Chancery Court Rules 34 and 45, and the Uniform Depositions and Discovery Act), with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Notice of Amended Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Jason Wheeler, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 203 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: 3/8/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Jeffrey B. Straubel, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: 3/8/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Granted (RELIFORD, JUSTIN O.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin O. Reliford on behalf of Co-Lead Plaintiffs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: 3/8/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RELIFORD, JUSTIN O.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin O. Reliford on behalf of Co-Lead Plaintiffs, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 200 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Service to Tesla, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents and Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to Tesla, Inc., and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 199 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: 3/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Notice of Depositions of Hayden Barnard, and Tanguy Serra, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: 3/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Jeff Evanson, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 197 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: 3/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Innisfree M&A Incorporated, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 196 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: 2/27/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted (Stipulation and Proposed Order Amending Case Schedule, filed on behalf of the parties)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 195 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation and Proposed Order Amending Case Schedule, filed on behalf of the parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 194 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Collective Objections of Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk to Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 193 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: 2/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoenas Ad Testificandum Directed to Hayden Barnard, Tanguy Serra, Radford Small, and Jason Wheeler, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 192 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Donald R. Kendall, Jr., with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 191 Filed: 2/18/2019, Entered: 2/18/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Evercore Group L.L.C., with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 190 Filed: 2/18/2019, Entered: 2/18/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Lazard Freres & Co. LLP, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 189 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: 2/12/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoenas Ad Testificandum Directed to John H.N. Fisher, Nancy Pfund, Lyndon Rive, and Peter Rive, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 188 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Service to Tesla Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 187 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Directed to Citigroup Global Markets Inc., and Novogradac & Company LLP, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 186 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Commission for Issuance of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Jon McNeill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: 2/6/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Motion for Commission for Issuance of Subpoena Ad Testificandum Directed to Jon McNeill, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 184 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of (1) Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to Tesla, Inc.; (2) Second Request for Production of Documents Directed to Tesla, Inc.; and (3) this Notice of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 183 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents Directed to Tesla, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Notice of Depositions of Kimbal Musk, Robyn Denholm, Jeffrey B. Straubel, Steve Jurvetson, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio Gracias, Brad W. Buss, and Elon Musk, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 181 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Delaware Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., with Delaware Chancery Court Rule 45
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 180 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs Notice of Service of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Directed to Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., and Ernst & Young LLP, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 179 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Donald R. Kendall, Jr., with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 178 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Service to Tesla Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 177 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Notice of Issuance to Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Donald R. Kendall, Jr., with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 176 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of 1) First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Brad W. Buss, Robyn Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J Gracia, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk, and 2) this Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 175 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (BERGER, DANIEL L.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel L. Berger on behalf of Co-Lead Plaintiffs, with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 174 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BERGER, DANIEL L.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel L. Berger on behalf of Co-Lead Plaintiffs, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 173 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of Appearance of Christine M. Mackintosh on behalf of Plaintiffs Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund, and Felix Rovelli, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 172 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted (MARTIN, AMY: [Proposed] Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy Martin on behalf of Plaintiffs.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 171 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Granted (GOODSON, JOHN C.: [Proposed] Order Granting the Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C. Goodson on behalf of Plaintiffs.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 170 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MARTIN, AMY: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy Martin on behalf of Plaintiffs, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 169 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    GOODSON, JOHN C.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C. Goodson on behalf of Plaintiffs, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Space Exploration Technologies Corp., with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 167 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted ([Proposed] Order Amending Order for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Amend the Order for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 165 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting the Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of Labaton Sucharow LLP on Behalf of Plaintiffs Arkansas Teacher Retirement System and Boston Retirement System)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 164 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of Labaton Sucharow LLP on Behalf of Plaintiffs Arkansas Teacher Retirement System and Boston Retirement System with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 163 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Service of (i) Responding Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Individual Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs; and (2) this Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) The Individual Defendants' Responses and Objections to Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 161 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Service of Tesla's Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents, and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 160 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) The Individual Defendants' Responses and Objections to Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents Directed to The Individual Defendants; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 159 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Service of Tesla Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents, and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 158 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of Appearance of Jay G. Stirling, on behalf of nominal defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 157 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Service of (1) Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants; and (2) this Notice of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 156 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Individual Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 155 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Regarding Case Schedule, entered by Vice Chancellor Slights on August 14, 2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 154 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Letter on Behalf of the Parties Regarding Proposed Case Schedule and Attaching Parties' [Proposed] Orders Regarding Case Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 153 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation and Order for the Production and Exchange of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information, approved by Vice Chancellor Slights on August 3, 2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 152 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for the Production and Exchange of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 151 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Directed to DBL Partners, and Nancy Pfund, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 150 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted (ZAGAR, ERIC L.: [Proposed] Order Granting the Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric L. Zagar on behalf of Plaintiffs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 149 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ZAGAR, ERIC L.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric L. Zagar on Behalf of Plaintiffs with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 148 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Directed to John H.N. Fisher, Lyndon Rive, Peter Rive, and Draper Fisher Jurvetson, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 147 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Valor Management Corp., with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 146 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Service of (1) Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents Directed to the Individual Defendants; and (2) this Notice of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 145 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Directed to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., and Lazard Freres & Co. LLC, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer of Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc., and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for the Substitution of Counsel for Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for the Substitution of Counsel for Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 141 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLIC VERSION of Defendants' Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Verified Class Action of Derivative Complaint (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendants' Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Verified Class Action of Derivative Complaint [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certified copy of Order dated 5-3-2018, to Clerk of Court below. Case closed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Entry of Appearance of Kelly L. Tucker on behalf of Plaintiff Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirement System, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 137 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Denying Defendants' Application for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal, entered by Vice Chancellor Slights on April 27, 2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 135 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 134 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from James Sabella enclosing courtesy copies of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Application for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 133 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Application for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal, with Certificate of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 132 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Denied (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order extending time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Application for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 131 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation and [Proposed] Order extending time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Application for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 130 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Garrett B. Moritz to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III enclosing courtesy copies of (i) Defendants' Application for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal; and (ii) [Proposed] Order Granting Certification of Interlocutory Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 129 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' Application for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 128 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Opinion issued by Vice Chancellor Slights on March 28, 2018 on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Verified Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 127 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: 12/26/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ARGUMENT RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS HELD ON DECEMBER 13, 2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 126 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from James Sabella in response to Defendants' December 20, 2017 letter.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 125 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Garrett B. Moritz regarding recent Delaware Supreme Court decision in Dell Inc. v. Magnetar Global Event Driven Master Fund Ltd., No. 565, 2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Dismiss before Vice Chancellor Slights on 12.13.2017. Decision Reserved. See Transcript.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter, dated August 23, 2017, from VC Slights to counsel scheduling oral argument for December 13, 2017, at 2:00 p.m., in Wilmington concerning Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Verified Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Public Version of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Garrett B. Moritz enclosing courtesy copies of (i) Defendants' Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; and (ii) the Transmittal Affidavit of Benjamin Z. Grossberg in support thereof
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 118 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from James J. Sabella enclosing courtesy copies of Plaintiffs' Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (CONFIDENTIAL FILING).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Granted (Kirk, David E.: [Proposed] Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of Defendants Tesla, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Kirk, David E.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tesla, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 113 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Public Version of the Transmittal Affidavit of Garrett B. Moritz in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Public Version of Defendants' Opening Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 111 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit 17 to Transmittal Affidavit of Garrett B. Moritz in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendants' Opening Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of Appearance of Benjamin Z. Grossberg on behalf of Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 108 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of John A. Eakins, Esquire on behalf of Defendants )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 107 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of John A. Eakins, Esquire (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 106 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order governing briefing on Defendants’ motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 105 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order governing briefing on Defendants’ motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Verified Class Action and Derivative Complaint (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 103 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Redacted Public Version of Second Amended Verified Class Action and Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second Amended Verified Class Action and Derivative Complaint [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Authorizing Filing of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Verified Class Action and Derivative Complaint as a Confidential Filing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Authorizing Filing of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Verified Class Action and Derivative Complaint as a Confidential Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Garrett B. Moritz enclosing courtesy copies of Defendants' Opening Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Entry of Appearance of John A. Eakins of Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP as counsel on behalf of Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Service of 1) Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Tesla Motors, Inc. and 2) Co-Lead Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Tesla Motors, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Granted (Amended [Proposed] Order for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 92 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted (Amended [Proposed] Order of Consolidation)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of 10.10.16 Oral Argument on Cross Motions for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Rulings of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Dated October 17, 2016 to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III from James J. Sabella, Esquire Enclosing the Amended [Proposed] Order for Consolidation and Amended {Proposed} Order for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter, dated October 13, 2016, from VC Slights to counsel canceling oral argument scheduled for October 14, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. on the pending motions to expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: 10/10/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order for Consolidation, Granted by Vice Chancellor Joseph R. Slights, III on October 10, 2016.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: 10/10/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order for Appointment of Lead Counsel, Granted by Vice Chancellor Joseph R. Slights, III on October 10, 2016.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: 10/10/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Hearing on Appointment of Lead Counsel, held before Vice Chancellor Joseph R. Slights, III on October 10, 2016.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: 10/10/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Dated October 10, 2016 to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III from James J. Sabella, Esquire Enclosing Courtesy Copies of the Response in Further Support of Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel and Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: 10/10/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED, PUBLIC VERSION -- Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund's Reply Brief in Further Support of its Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and in Opposition to the Leadership Motions by the Institutional Investors and the Individual Investors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 10/9/2016, Entered: 10/9/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Public Redacted Version of Response in Further Support of Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 10/8/2016, Entered: 10/8/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Carmella P. Keener, Esq. to Honorable Joseph R. Slights regarding failure of electronic filing platform and timing of October 7, 2016 filing by Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund's Reply Brief in Further Support of its Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and in Opposition to the Leadership Motions by The Institutional Investors and The Individual Investors [CONFIDENTIAL -- FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [CONFIDENTIAL] Response in Further Support of Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Brief in Further Support of The Individual Investors' Motion for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel with attached Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel (with Certificate of Service) (7 pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter dated October 7, 2016 to the Register in Chancery Regarding Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel and Brief in Support thereof
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Institutional Plaintiffs' Response in Further Support of Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel as a Confidential
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Leave to File response in Further Support of Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel as a Confidential Filing (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Granted ([Proposed] Confidential Treatment-Sealing Order Granting Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund's Motion to File its Reply Brief To Its Motion For Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And Lead Counsel And In Opposition To The Leadership Motions By The Institutional Plaintiffs And The Individual Investors)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund's Motion to File its Reply Brief to its Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and in Opposition to the Leadership Motions by the Institutional Plaintiffs and the Individual Investors as a Confidential Filling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Granted (Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas Porritt on behalf of Plaintiffs Ellen Prasinos, Pyare Diwana, Nam T. Nguyen, and Thomas J. Wolf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eduard Korsinsky on behalf of Plaintiffs Ellen Prasinos, Pyare Diwana, Nam T. Nguyen, and Thomas J. Wolf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted (Bernstein, Stanley D.: Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas Porritt on behalf of Plaintiffs Ellen Prasinos, Pyare Diwana, Nam T. Nguyen, and Thomas J. Wolf
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eduard Korsinsky on behalf of Plaintiffs Ellen Prasinos, Pyare Diwana, Nam T. Nguyen, and Thomas J. Wolf
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Compliance with Typeface Requirement and Type-Volume Limitation for Brief in Support of Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stanley D. Bernstein filed on behalf of Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Redacted Public Version of the Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated October 6, 2016 to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III from James J. Sabella, Esquire Enclosing Courtesy Copies of Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel and Brief in Support thereof
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Michael P. Kelly Re: Courtesy Copies of the Individual Investors' Motion for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel, Brief in Support of Motion for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel, and Supporting Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The Individual Investors' Brief In Support Of Their Motion For Appointment Of Co-Lead Plaintiffs And Co-Lead Counsel with attached Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel with attached Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Jessica Zeldin to Vice Chancellor Slights enclosing courtesy copies of City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and supporting brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Compliance to Brief in Support of Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief in Support of Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service for Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Intervene (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          GREEN CARD RETURN ANTIONIIO J. GRACIAS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel as a Confidential Filing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Green Card Returns
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Green Card Returns
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel as a Confidential Filing with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Amended Verified Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Verified Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE HELD ON 9-23-2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order of Consolidation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Granted (Winter, Steven P.: [Proposed] Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Winter, Steven P.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Granted (Meil, Graham W.: [Proposed] Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Meli, Graham W.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter, dated September 23, 2016, from VC Slights to counsel setting forth revised schedule for consolidation, leadership structure, and expedition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Granted (Savitt, William: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Savitt, William: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Savitt on behalf of Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of Appearance of James J. Sabella on Behalf of Interested Party Felix Rovelli (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from P. Bradford deLeeuw to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III enclosing a [Proposed] Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from David E. Ross to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III on behalf of the Tesla Defendants addressing two issues in advance of conference call scheduled for today
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Vice Chancellor Joseph R. Slights III from Michael P. Kelly Regarding Scheduling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Michael P. Kelly Re: Unredacted Copy of the Verified Complaint filed in C.A. No. 12740
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena to Evercore Group, L.L.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Vice Chancellor Joseph R. Slights, III from Ned Weinberger, Esq. regarding scheduling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (OTTENSOSER, U. SETH -- Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission to represent plaintiff)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OTTENSOSER, U. SETH -- Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice to represent plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter, dated September 21, 2016, from VC Slights to counsel rescheduling the teleconference concerning a revision of the current schedule on the pending motions to expedite from September 22, 2016 to September 23, 2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System's Motion to Intervene (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter, dated September 20, 2016, from VC Slights to counsel in response to Jessica Zeldin's Letter of September 19, 2016, requesting revision of the current schedule concerning the motions to expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Register's Certificate dated Sept. 14, 2016, pursuant to 10 Del.C. 3114.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Jessica Zeldin to Vice Chancellor Slights requesting review of previously set schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Opening Brief in Support of Its Motion for Expedited Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Institutional Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel as a Confidential Filing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter, dated September 16, 2016, from VC Slights to counsel setting schedule and argument dates regarding consolidation and leadership structure, and motion(s) for expedited proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Institutional Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: 9/14/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter dated September 14, 2016 to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights from James J. Sabella, Esquire Enclosing Courtesy Copies of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System Motion to Intervene, Memorandum of Law in Support thereof and [Proposed] Order granting the Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: 9/14/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Intervene on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of Appearance of Jessica Zeldin and P. Bradford deLeeuw for plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III from Michael P. Kelly Re: Outstanding Issues and Rescheduling of Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from David E. Ross to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III on behalf of the Tesla Director Defendants and Tesla Motors regarding update as to status of actions and to address preliminary scheduling matters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of Appearance of Joel Friedlander and Jeffrey M. Gorris of Friedlander & Gorris, P.A. on behalf of Roofers Local 149 Pension Fund with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Reassignment Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from David E. Ross to The Honorable Andre G. Bouchard responding to the Court's letter regarding consolidation and leadership structure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Entry of Appearance of David E. Ross and Garrett B. Moritz of Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP on behalf of Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Entry of Appearance of Blake a. Bennett and Cooch and Taylor P.A. on behalf of interested party, Daniel Schiffrin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Counsel regarding consolidation and the motion for expedited proceedings filed in C.A. No. 12723-CB
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement Pursuant to Rule 4(d)(c) requesting that your office complete service upon the individual defendants (1. Elon Musk; 2. Antonio J. Gracias; 3. Robyn M. Denholm; 4. Kimbal Musk; 5. Steve Jurvetson 6. Ira Ehrenpreis 7. Brad W. Buss 8. J.B. Straubel 9. Lyndon Rive; and 10. Peter Rive) of Tesla Motors, Inc. pursuant to 10 Del. C. Sec. 3114
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Service of Plaintiff City of Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund's First Request for Production of Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service of Summons on the Individual Defendants (1. Elon Musk; 2. Antonio J. Gracias; 3. Robyn M. Denholm; 4. Kimbal Musk; 5. Steve Jurvetson; 6. Ira Ehrenpreis; 7. Brad W. Buss; 8. J.B. Straubel; 9. Lyndon Rive; and 10. Peter Rive) of Tesla Motors, Inc., with Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service of Summons on Tesla Motors, Inc. and D Subsidiary, Inc., with Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issued (1) 3114 summons to special process server (10 copies); Issued (1) summons to special process server (2 copies) on 9.7.16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Instruction Letter from Carmella P. Keener to the Office of the Register in Chancery requesting that your office prepare a Summons for service upon Tesla Motors, Inc. and D Subsidiary, Inc. and a Summons Pursuant to 10 Del. C. Sec. 3114 on All Individual Defendants of Tesla Motors, Inc. (Elon Musk, Antonio J. Gracias, Robyn M. Denholm, Kimbal Musk, Steve Jurvetson, Ira Ehrenpreis, Brad W. Buss, J.B. Straubel, Lyndon Rive and Peter Rive)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: 9/1/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Verified Derivative Complaint [for breach of fiduciary duties]

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 18,377 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?