Bonano v. Alonso et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-03646
District Judge Loretta A. Preska, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2016 at 8:40 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Bonano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DIN# 11-R-1271

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Bonano
v.
No Logo Aldysius Sosic, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Schaeffer, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Warshawer, Defendant
No Logo Ann Pfau, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin Kanstroom, Defendant
No Logo Bill Chalavoupis, Defendant
No Logo Blaine Fogg, Defendant
No Logo Bonnie French, Defendant
No Logo Brian Stanley, Defendant
No Logo Charles Campisi, Defendant
No Logo Christopher McGuire, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Alonso, Defendant
No Logo Frank Rizzo, Defendant
No Logo Irwin Shaw, Defendant
No Logo Ivelisse Matos, Defendant
No Logo Jaime Noriega, Defendant
No Logo James Fritz, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Chief Counsel, Defendant
No Logo John Feinblatt, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan Lippman, Defendant
No Logo Karen Friedman Agnifilo , Defendant
No Logo Katherine Lemire, Defendant
No Logo Lieutenant Lampone, Defendant
No Logo Lt. John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Lucius Craig, Defendant
No Logo Mark Dwyer, Defendant
No Logo Michael Barry, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Michael J. Obus, Defendant
No Logo New York County District Attorney's Office, Defendant
No Logo New York County Legal Aid Society, Defendant
New York City Police Department New York City Police Department, Defendant
Officially listed as "New York Police Department"
No Logo Officer John Doe # 1, Defendant
No Logo Officer John Doe # 2, Defendant
No Logo Officer John Doe # 3, Defendant
No Logo Officer John Doe # 4, Defendant
No Logo Officer John Doe # 5, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Nunez, Defendant
No Logo Rachel S. Pauley, Defendant
No Logo Raymond W Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Richard Verchick, Defendant
No Logo Robert Moregenthau, Defendant
No Logo Seymour W. James, Defendant
No Logo Steven Banks, Defendant
No Logo Theodore A. Levine, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 8 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Bonano USCA Case Number 12-3412. Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis . Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 04/17/2013. (nd) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF APPEAL from 7 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 4 Order of Dismissal, 5 Judgment. Document filed by Michael Bonano. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER denying 6 Motion for Reconsideration. Accordingly, Plaintiff's submission, construed as a Motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e), is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to vacate the May 11, 2012 Order granting IFP and the portion of the June 8, 2012 Order dismissing the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), (iii). Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1), (2). Because the portions of the Complaint that were treated as a Petition for Habeas Corpus relief make no substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. 28 U.S.C. § 2253. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/7/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Reconsideration re: 4 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Michael Bonano.(msa) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          CIVIL JUDGMENT: ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That the Complaint is dismissed. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), (iii). The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from the Court's Judgment would not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/8/2012) Copies Mailed By Docket Services. (mro) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket and to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Plaintiff's Complaint, filed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C.§ 1915(a)(1), is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), (iii). Because the portions of the Complaint that were treated as a Petition for Habeas Corpus relief make no substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. 28 U.S.C. § 2253. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/8/2012) Copies Mailed By Docket Services. (mro) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Pro Se Acknowledgment Letter Mailed: Pro Se acknowledgment letter mailed to the plaintiff via USPS to the address noted on the Complaint on 5/21/12. (mt) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/21/2012) (mt). (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without payment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/11/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  COMPLAINT against Karen Friedman Agnifilo, Daniel Alonso, Steven Banks, Michael Barry, Michael Bloomberg, Charles Campisi, Bill Chalavoupis, Lucius Craig, Mark Dwyer, John Feinblatt, Blaine Fogg, Bonnie French, James Fritz, Seymour W. James, John Doe, Chief Counsel, Benjamin Kanstroom, Raymond W. Kelly, Katherine Lemire, Theodore A. Levine, Lieutenant Lampone, Jonathan Lippman, Lt. John Doe, Ivelisse Matos, Christopher McGuire, Robert Moregenthau, New York County District Attorney's Office, New York County Legal Aid Society, New York Police Department, Jaime Noriega, Patricia Nunez, Michael J. Obus, Officer John Doe # 1, Officer John Doe # 2, Officer John Doe # 3, Officer John Doe # 4, Officer John Doe # 5, Rachel S. Pauley, Ann Pfau, Frank Rizzo, Andrew Schaeffer, Irwin Shaw, Aldysius Sosic, Brian Stanley, Richard Verchick, Andrew Warshawer. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number NONE PROVIDED)Document filed by Michael Bonano. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(mt) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 61 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?