Yeatts v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00706

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2019 at 4:38 PM ST (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Appeal Transcript Request
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Short Record Sent to USCA
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Clerks Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Continue
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Memorandum In Support
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compel
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Seal
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Sealed document
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Sealed document
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Sealed document
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Sealed document
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Sealed document
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. The Court GRANTS IN PART Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as to Counts II and III and DENIES IN PART Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as to Count I. Plaintiff Alejandro Yeatts may file an Amended Complaint by 5/1/2017. If no Amended Complaint is filed, Defendant's Answer to Count I of Plaintiff's original Complaint is due by 5/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/1717. (cer)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Full Consent to Magistrate Judge - Standard
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/25/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?