Carrico v. CRST Malone, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 9:16-cv-00168

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 6:51 PM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mickie Carrico, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1020

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Scott Tilton +1 713 774 8600 +1 713 222 2124 mtilton@tiltonlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Crst Expedited, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah Marie Davis +1 713 659 6767 +1 713 759 6830 sarah.davis@wilsonelser.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
No Logo CRST International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah Marie Davis +1 713 659 6767 +1 713 759 6830 sarah.davis@wilsonelser.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Crst Malone, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah Marie Davis +1 713 659 6767 +1 713 759 6830 sarah.davis@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Tyron Jerome Chambers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah Marie Davis +1 713 659 6767 +1 713 759 6830 sarah.davis@wilsonelser.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/2/17. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Mickie Carrico. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Tilton, Michael)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER ON CLOSING DOCUMENTS. All parties or their counsel shall submit to the court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of this court on or before August 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/30/17. (ljw, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Settlement by Mickie Carrico (Tilton, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER that the Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Defendant's Expert Deadline and Dispositive Motions Deadline 16 isGRANTED. The amended deadline for parties designate expert witnesses and reports on issues for which the party does not bear the burden of proof is June 9, 2017, and the amended deadline for dispositive motions is June 23, 2017. This Order does not affect the other deadlines set forth in the controlling Scheduling Order 10 . Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/10/17. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Defendants' Expert Deadline and Dispositive Motions Deadline by CRST Malone, Inc., Tyron Jerome Chambers. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The amended deadline to designate expert witnesses and reports on issues for which the party does not bear the burden of proof is 5/10/2017, and the amended deadline for dispositive motions is 5/24/2017. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/3/2017. (bjc, ) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants Expert Designations by CRST Malone, Inc., Tyron Jerome Chambers. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        First Amended ANSWER to Complaint by CRST Malone, Inc., Tyron Jerome Chambers.(Adams, Kent)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: 2/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE by Mickie Carrico Plaintiff's Expert Designation (Tilton, Michael)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/7/16. (ljw, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: The Case Management Conference set for December 19, 2016, in this matter is CANCELLED. Docket Call and Final Pretrial Conference are set for 11/30/2017 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 13 (Lufkin) before Judge Ron Clark. Jury Selection and Trial are set for 12/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/7/16. (ljw, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against CRST Expedited, Inc. and CRST International, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This Order does not affect any claims asserted against either of the remaining two defendants in the case, Defendant CRST Malone, Inc. and Defendant Tyron Jerome Chambers. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/7/16. (ljw, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc., CRST Malone, Inc., Tyron Jerome Chambers. (Adams, Kent)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Mickie Carrico. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Order of Dismissal without Prejudice)(Tilton, Michael)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                      Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc., CRST Malone, Inc., Tyron Jerome Chambers . (Adams, Kent)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adams, Kent)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: 11/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE by Mickie Carrico Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Tilton, Michael)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: 11/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc., CRST Malone, Inc., Tyron Jerome Chambers Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit)(Adams, Kent)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on December 20, 2016, at 2:00p.m., in the Video Conference Room, Ward R. Burke United States Courthouse, 104 North Third Street, Lufkin, Texas. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/24/16. (ljw, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc., CRST Malone, Inc., Tyron Jerome Chambers (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5982298), filed by CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc., CRST Malone, Inc., Tyron Jerome Chambers. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A- State Court File, # 3 Attorney Party List)(Adams, Kent)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?