HomeLife in the Gardens, LLC v. Landry
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-15549

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2019 at 5:43 PM ST (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (88) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Seal Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Witness List
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER AND REASONS granting 75 Motion to Quash. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the subpoenas issued to Christopher Vincent and Madro Bandaries are QUASHED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/6/2018. (cg)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Conference
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; the motion is DENIED with respect to Landry's assault and battery claim. In all other respects, the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/9/2018. (blg)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER AND REASONS denying 81 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/5/2018. (blg)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/1/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Quash
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Withdraw Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/29/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/8/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Set Aside Default
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Trial Exhibit List
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Set Aside Default
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Order Transferring Case
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?