Riecke, Edgar the Estate of et al v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-01044

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 10, 2018 at 4:36 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeff Riecke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by AMES & AMES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Byron L. Ames +1 435 214 0303

Toggle Switch Represented by Messner Reeves, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Caleb Meyer +1 303 623 1800 +1 303 623 0552 cmeyer@messner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Michael Royval +1 303 623 1800 aroyval@messner.com
No Logo Katie Riecke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by AMES & AMES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Byron L. Ames +1 435 214 0303

Toggle Switch Represented by Messner Reeves, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Caleb Meyer +1 303 623 1800 +1 303 623 0552 cmeyer@messner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Michael Royval +1 303 623 1800 aroyval@messner.com
No Logo Riecke, Edgar the Estate of, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by AMES & AMES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Byron L. Ames +1 435 214 0303

Toggle Switch Represented by Messner Reeves, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Caleb Meyer +1 303 623 1800 +1 303 623 0552 cmeyer@messner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Michael Royval +1 303 623 1800 aroyval@messner.com
No Logo Sarah Early, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by AMES & AMES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Byron L. Ames +1 435 214 0303

Toggle Switch Represented by Messner Reeves, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Caleb Meyer +1 303 623 1800 +1 303 623 0552 cmeyer@messner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Michael Royval +1 303 623 1800 aroyval@messner.com
v.
No Logo Antonia Michelson, Defendant
No Logo Boy Scouts Of America, Defendant
No Logo Brad Ewell, Defendant
No Logo Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The, Defendant
No Logo Clark, Martin, Defendant
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant
No Logo David Michelson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by PETERSEN & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd R. Jones +1 801 328 5555 lloyd.jones@farmers.com
No Logo Greg Day, Defendant
No Logo Logan Mackay, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strong & Hanni

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter H. Barlow +1 801 532 7080 pbarlow@strongandhanni.com
No Logo Marc Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Matt Day, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by SCALLEY READING BATES HANSEN & RASMUSSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David S. Bridge +1 801 531 7870 dbridge@scalleyreading.net
No Logo Scott Michelson, Defendant
No Logo Trapper Trails Council Boy Scouts of America, Defendant
No Logo Boy Scouts Of America, Cross Defendant
No Logo Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The, Cross Defendant
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Cross Defendant
No Logo David Michelson, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by PETERSEN & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd R. Jones +1 801 328 5555 lloyd.jones@farmers.com
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Sealed Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Antonia Michelson, David Michelson, Scott Michelson (Jones, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Karmen Schmid on behalf of Logan Mackay (Schmid, Karmen) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order 5 filed by Defendant Matt Day (Bridge, David) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin D. Gibb on behalf of Matt Day (Gibb, Dustin) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron M. Hancock on behalf of Marc Anderson, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Greg Day, Brad Ewell, Clark Martin (Hancock, Cameron) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.. (Swenson, Swen) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      COP's ANSWER to 18 Crossclaim filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints..(Swenson, Swen) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Meyer, M.) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A. Turnblom on behalf of Antonia Michelson, David Michelson, Scott Michelson (Turnblom, Todd) (Entered: 01/16/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Trystan B. Smith on behalf of Antonia Michelson, David Michelson, Scott Michelson (Smith, Trystan) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jackie Bosshardt on behalf of Marc Anderson, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Greg Day, Brad Ewell, Clark Martin (Bosshardt, Jackie) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 32 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ANSWER to 18 Crossclaim filed by Boy Scouts of America. Attorney Michael F. Skolnick added to party Boy Scouts of America(pty:crd)(Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by IPT Clerk)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html, should be prepared 21 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to ipt@utd.uscourts.gov21 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/ipt.htmlIf counsel or the parties would like to participate by phone they must contact the IPT Clerk at least two days in advance at ipt@utd.uscourts.gov to make arrangements. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (jds) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.. Attorney Swen R. Swenson added to party Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.(pty:dft)(Swenson, Swen) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, filed by Greg Day. Attorney Swen R. Swenson added to party Greg Day(pty:dft)(Swenson, Swen) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, filed by Clark Martin. Attorney Swen R. Swenson added to party Clark Martin(pty:dft)(Swenson, Swen) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, filed by Brad Ewell. Attorney Swen R. Swenson added to party Brad Ewell(pty:dft)(Swenson, Swen) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, filed by Marc Anderson. Attorney Swen R. Swenson added to party Marc Anderson(pty:dft)(Swenson, Swen) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Gary T. Wight on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Trapper Trails Council Boy Scouts of America (Wight, Gary) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Trapper Trails Council Boy Scouts of America. Attorney Michael F. Skolnick added to party Trapper Trails Council Boy Scouts of America(pty:dft)(Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Boy Scouts of America. Attorney Michael F. Skolnick added to party Boy Scouts of America(pty:dft)(Skolnick, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Matt Day. (jds) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Defendant Matt Day's ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Matt Day. Attorney David S. Bridge added to party Matt Day(pty:dft)(Bridge, David) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference (jds) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Sarah Early, Katie Riecke, Riecke, Edgar the Estate of, Defendants Logan Mackay, David Michelson. (jds) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            David Michelsen's ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Boy Scouts of America, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The filed by David Michelson. Attorney Lloyd R. Jones added to party David Michelson(pty:dft)(Jones, Lloyd) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeff Riecke, Riecke, Edgar the Estate of, Sarah Early, Katie Riecke as to Trapper Trails Council Boy Scouts of America Waiver sent on 10/7/2016, answer due 12/6/2016. (Meyer, M.) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeff Riecke, Riecke, Edgar the Estate of, Sarah Early, Katie Riecke as to Boy Scouts of America Waiver sent on 10/7/2016, answer due 12/6/2016. (Meyer, M.) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Matt Day as to Matt Day Waiver sent on 10/19/2016, answer due 12/19/2016. (Bridge, David) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Offer of Judgment by Logan Mackay (Barlow, Peter) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, filed by Logan Mackay. Attorney Peter H. Barlow added to party Logan Mackay(pty:dft)(Barlow, Peter) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Caleb Meyer,Adam M. Royval for Sarah Early,M. Caleb Meyer,Adam M. Royval for Jeff Riecke,M. Caleb Meyer,Adam M. Royval for Katie Riecke,M. Caleb Meyer,Adam M. Royval for Riecke, Edgar the Estate of. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov; granting 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Caleb Meyer,Adam M. Royval for Sarah Early,M. Caleb Meyer,Adam M. Royval for Jeff Riecke,M. Caleb Meyer,Adam M. Royval for Katie Riecke,M. Caleb Meyer,Adam M. Royval for Riecke, Edgar the Estate of. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/25/16. No attached document. (jlw) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/25/16. (jlw) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam M. Royval , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2622601, filed by Plaintiffs Sarah Early, Jeff Riecke, Katie Riecke, Riecke, Edgar the Estate of. (Ames, Byron) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by David Michelson, Antonia Michelson, Scott Michelson as to David Michelson Waiver sent on 10/10/2016, answer due 12/9/2016; Antonia Michelson Waiver sent on 10/10/2016, answer due 12/9/2016; Scott Michelson Waiver sent on 10/10/2016, answer due 12/9/2016. (Jones, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caleb Meyer , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2621959, filed by Plaintiffs Sarah Early, Jeff Riecke, Katie Riecke, Riecke, Edgar the Estate of. (Ames, Byron) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Standing Orders by Sarah Early, Jeff Riecke, Katie Riecke, Riecke, Edgar the Estate of (Ames, Byron) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Removed Defendants: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, A Utah Non Profit Corporation. filed by Jeff Riecke, Riecke, Edgar the Estate of, Sarah Early, Katie Riecke. (Ames, Byron) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Modification of Docket: Error: Disregard Entry #2. Counsel filed the complaint against all plaintiffs. Correction: Entry #3 is correct. Counsel refiled the complaint against all defendants. Answer records have been corrected. re 2 Complaint. (mms) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Marc Anderson, Boy Scouts of America, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, The, Greg Day, Matt Day, Brad Ewell, Logan Mackay, Clark Martin, Antonia Michelson, David Michelson, Scott Michelson, Trapper Trails Council Boy Scouts of America (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2611953) filed by Jeff Riecke, Riecke, Edgar the Estate of, Sarah Early, Katie Riecke. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Ames, Byron) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ENTRY ERROR DISREGARD COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2611953) filed by Sarah Early. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Ames, Byron) Modified by adding error text on 10/11/2016 (mms). (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs Sarah Early, Jeff Riecke, Katie Riecke, Riecke, Edgar the Estate of is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mms) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?