Derek Gubala v. Time Warner Cable, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 16-2613

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 12:48 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3490 - Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. With costs: yes. [41] [6813112] [16-2613] (CAG)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Filed opinion of the court by Judge Posner. AFFIRMED. Richard A. Posner, Circuit Judge; Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge and Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge. [40] [6813104] [16-2613] (CAG)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed Response by Appellant Derek Gubala to Appellee Time Warner Cable, Inc.'s Citation Of Additional Authority. [37][6808794] [16-2613] (Siprut, Joseph)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed Appellee Time Warner Cable Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). Argument set for: 01/04/2017. [36] [6808576] [16-2613] (Merryman, Bryan)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Argument reset for Wednesday, January 4, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 10 minutes. [35] [6808503] [16-2613] (RS)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Received argument confirmation from Bryan A. Merryman for Appellee Time Warner Cable. [34] [6803229] [16-2613] (Merryman, Bryan)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Received argument confirmation from Joseph J. Siprut for Appellant Derek Gubala. [33] [6803214] [16-2613] (Siprut, Joseph)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Argument set for Wednesday, January 4, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 15 minutes. [32] [6799888] [16-2613] (RS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Filed Non-Party motion for leave to file amicus brief in support of Plaintiff-Appellant by Electronic Privacy Information Center. [6789411] [16-2613] (Rotenberg, Marc)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Motion filed by Non-party National Association of Consumer Advocates Public Justice to file Amicus brief in support of Plaintiff-Appellant. [11] [6789239] [16-2613]--[Edited 10/11/2016 by VG - to reflect Non-party] (Weiner, Courtney)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Derek Gubala. Paper copies due on 10/11/2016 Electronically Transmitted. [10] [6787970] [16-2613] (RT)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Submitted appellant brief by Joseph J. Siprut for Appellant Derek Gubala. [9] [6787935] [16-2613] (Siprut, Joseph)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [7] Appellant's brief due on or before 10/04/2016 for Derek Gubala. Appellee's brief due on or before 11/03/2016 for Time Warner Cable. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/17/2016 for Appellant Derek Gubala. CMD [8] [6779346] [16-2613] (CR)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Motion filed by Appellant Derek Gubala to extend time to file appellant brief. [7] [6778449] [16-2613] (Siprut, Joseph)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 09/06/2016 for Derek Gubala. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/06/2016 for Time Warner Cable. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/20/2016 for Appellant Derek Gubala. RJS [6766596] [16-2613] (FP)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Bryan A. Merryman for Appellee Time Warner Cable. [5] [6765578] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [16-2613] (Merryman, Bryan)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 08/15/2016 for Derek Gubala. Appellee's brief due on or before 09/15/2016 for Time Warner Cable. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/29/2016 for Appellant Derek Gubala. RJS [6764271] [16-2613] (MM)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Notice of Circuit Rule 33 settlement conference issued. The conference will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, July 13, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [3] [6764268] [16-2613] (MM)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 288 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?