Walsh v. CorePower Yoga LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-05610

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 7, 2019 at 8:34 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William Walsh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Outten & Golden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jahan C. Sagafi +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jsagafi@outtengolden.com
v.
No Logo Corepower Yoga, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Status report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Status report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Status Report/Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of change of address
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 28 Motion for Settlement; granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Attorney Fees. Status Report due by 2/15/2018. Status Conference set for 2/22/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 10 Motion for Settlement. Motion for final approval and motion for fees & costs due by 4/17/2017. Fairness Hearing set for 6/15/2017 10:00 AM. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/17/2016. (svS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against CorePower Yoga LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10819575.). Filed byWilliam Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 10/3/2016) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?