People Of The State Of California v. Property Subject To Disposition $260,353.25 Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 15 514568
Superior Court Judge Ernest H. Goldsmith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo People of the State of California, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the District Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fong, Raymond +1 415 924 3800
No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Respondent
No Logo Property Subject To Disposition $260,353.25 U.s. Currency, Respondent
No Logo Liu, Viola, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wong & Hung

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vance Chang +1 510 451 2124
Cause of Action Petition For Forfeiture/asset Forfeiture
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Claimant Viola Liu's Motion To Return Property Illegally Seized, Respondent's Motion For The Return Of The Property Seized From Her Is Granted In Large Part (see Order For Full Text). Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn, Clerk: Sean Kane, Not Reported. (302/hk)
    Blank 16 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
    Mini Minutes For Mar-16-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016
      Order Granting Motion For Return Of Property Seized
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016
        Proof Of Service Of Opposition To Motion To Return Property Illegally Seized; Declaration Of Raymond Fong; Declaration Of Sergeant Yukio Ushita; Declaration Of Officer Ian Goold In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 58666262) Filed By Petitioner People Of The State Of California
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016
          Opposition To Motion To Return Property Illegally Seized; Declaration Of Raymond Fong; Declaration Of Sergeant Yukio Ushita; Declaration Of Officer Ian Goold In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 58666086) Filed By Petitioner People Of The State Of California
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016
            Notice Of State Of California Franchise Tax Board Order To Withhold Personal Income Tax (transaction Id # 58611740) Filed By Petitioner People Of The State Of California
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 11 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Mini Minutes For Jan-15-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                Blank 10 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Law And Motion 302, Claimant Viola Liu's Motion To Return Property Illegally Seized Is Continued To March 16, 2016 At 9:30 A.m., In Dept. 302, Per The Agreement Of The Parties. Judge: Ernest Goldsmith. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Not Reported. (302/eg)
                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 16011081) Filed By Claimant Liu, Viola
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016 Proof Of Electronic Service
                    Proof Of Electronic Service (transaction Id # 16011081) Filed By Claimant Liu, Viola
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016
                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion (transaction Id # 16011081) Filed By Claimant Liu, Viola
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016
                        Notice Of Motion And Motion To Return Property Illegally Seized (transaction Id # 16011081) Filed By Claimant Liu, Viola Hearing Set For Jan-15-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: 12/31/2015
                          Declaration Of Personal Service On Interested Party Viola Liu (15-115) Of Petition For Forfeiture (transaction Id # 58362304) Filed By Petitioner People Of The State Of California
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: 12/30/2015
                            Proof Of Electronic Service_claim Opposing Forfeiture (transaction Id # 15362097) Filed By Claimant Liu, Viola
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Claim Opposing Forfeiture
                              Claim Opposing Forfeiture In Response To A Judicial Petition For Forfeiture (transaction Id # 15333034) Filed By Claimant Liu, Viola
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015
                                Notice Notice Of Seizure And Notice Of Initiation Of Judicial Forfeiture Proceedings (transaction Id # 58164309) Filed By Petitioner People Of The State Of California
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015 Petition For Forfeiture
                                  Petition For Forfeiture Filed By Petitioner People Of The State Of California As To Respondent Property Subject To Disposition $260,353.25 U.s. Currency Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                    Request RequestSpace

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 434 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?