Ubs Financial Services, Inc. v. Kenneth Allen Winn
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 15 514601
Superior Court Judge Ernest H. Goldsmith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
UBS Financial Services, Inc. UBS Financial Services, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
v.
No Logo Winn, Kenneth Allen, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 16031045)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 Court Judgment - General
    The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Petitioner Ubs Financial Services, Inc. Recover From Respondent Winn, Kenneth Allen Total Judgment In The Amount Of $114,667.47. See Scanned Doc
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/6/2016
      Order Granting Ubs Financial Services, Inc.'s Petition And Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 9 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Mini Minutes For Jan-04-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 8 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/4/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Ubs Financial Services, Inc's Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. The Prevailing Party Is To Provide A Form Of Order. Judge: Ernest Goldsmith. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Reporter: Melanie Gheno, Csr #7489. (302/eg)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: 12/4/2015 Proof of Service of Summons
            Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 100009807), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Petitioner Ubs Financial Services, Inc. Served Nov-23-2015, Personal Service On Respondent Winn, Kenneth Allen
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015
              Exhibits To Declaration Of Francesca Lanpher In Support Of Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 15322064) Filed By Petitioner Ubs Financial Services, Inc.
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015
                Declaration Of Francesca Lanpher In Support Of Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 15322064) Filed By Petitioner Ubs Financial Services, Inc.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 4 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                  Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 15322064) Filed By Petitioner Ubs Financial Services, Inc.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015
                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 15322064) Filed By Petitioner Ubs Financial Services, Inc.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015
                      Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 15322064) Filed By Petitioner Ubs Financial Services, Inc. Hearing Set For Jan-04-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                        Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Ubs Financial Services, Inc. As To Respondent Winn, Kenneth Allen Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                          Request RequestSpace

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 38 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?