In Re: Allison Munoz
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514747
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Munoz, Jose, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Mika Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mika Brown +1 415 692 7540
No Logo Munoz, Allison, Claimant
Cause of Action Petition For Compromise Of Claim
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
Uncontested Calendar Of Jun-23-2016 Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into An Annuity Off Calendar. Proof Of Purchase Of Annuity Filed. No Appearances. (514)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016
    Supplemental Declaration Of Rebecca L. Byrne, Esq. Re Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Annuity (transaction Id # 16172021) Filed By Petitioner Munoz, Jose
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016
      Declaration Of Rebecca L. Byrne, Esq. Re Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Annuity (transaction Id # 100021285) Filed By Petitioner Munoz, Jose
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016
        Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim Of Minor
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 9 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Added To Calendar For Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into An Annuity Hearing Set For Jun-23-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
            Blank 8 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Uncontested Calendar Of Mar-24-2016, Minor's Compromise Granted Per Written Order. Mika J. Brown, Esq., And Rebecca L. Byrne, Esq., Appearing For Petitioner Jose Munoz. Judge: Joseph M. Quinn, Clerk: A. Mok. Proceedings Reported By Csr: Mitch Lyon, Csr#6840. (514)
              Blank 7 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Mini Minutes For Mar-24-2016 09:00 Am For Dept 514
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                Waiver Of Disqualification Filed By Petitioner Munoz, Jose
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
                  Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (jose Munoz Is Appointed As The Guardian Ad Litem For Minor Allison Munoz) Filed By Petitioner Munoz, Jose
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Fee For Application For Gal Filed By Petitioner Munoz, Jose
                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      Minor's Compromise Filed By Petitioner Munoz, Jose Hearing Set For Mar-24-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Petitioner Munoz, Jose
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016
                          Petition For Compromise Of Claim Of Minor Filed By Petitioner Munoz, Jose As To Claimant Munoz, Allison Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                            Request RequestSpace

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 135 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?