Morgan Stanley Smith Barney Llc v. Arnold Levins
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514749
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Morgan Stanley Smith Barney Llc, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason R Lindsay +1 310 586 7700
v.
No Logo Levins, Arnold, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Morgan Stanley Smith Barney Llc's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. Order And Separate Judgment Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Not Reported.
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Text Judgment
    The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: See Scanned Document
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 9 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Mini Minutes For Apr-06-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016
        Order On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016
          Notice Of Non-opposition To Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 58777134) Filed By Petitioner Morgan Stanley Smith Barney Llc
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016 Proof of Service
            Proof Of Service Of Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 58619639) Filed By Petitioner Morgan Stanley Smith Barney Llc Served Feb-06-2016, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Respondent Levins, Arnold
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 5 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 58511921) Filed By Petitioner Morgan Stanley Smith Barney Llc
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016
                Notice Of Hearing Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 58511921) Filed By Petitioner Morgan Stanley Smith Barney Llc Hearing Set For Apr-06-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm
                  Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 58511921) Filed By Petitioner Morgan Stanley Smith Barney Llc
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016
                    Declaration Of Jason R Lindsay In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 58511921) Filed By Petitioner Morgan Stanley Smith Barney Llc
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                      Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Morgan Stanley Smith Barney Llc As To Respondent Levins, Arnold Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                        Request RequestSpace

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 150 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?