In Re: Brian Wei Jian Feng
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514764
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Feng, Ying Chi On Behalf Of Minor Brian Wei Jian Feng, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Meisel & Krentsa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Edward Krentsa +1 415 788 2035
No Logo Feng, Brian Wei Jian, Claimant
Cause of Action Petition For Compromise Of Claim
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
Uncontested Calendar Of Jun-16-2016 Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account Off Calendar. Receipt On File. (514)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Bloc
    Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account (transaction Id # 100017473) Filed By Petitioner Feng, Ying Chi On Behalf Of Minor Brian Wei Jian Feng
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 7 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Added To Calendar For Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account Hearing Set For Jun-16-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016
        Order To Deposit Money Into Blocked Account
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016
          Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim Of Minor
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016
            Declaration Of Declaration Of The Medical Payment Benefits In Support Of Claimants Expedited Petition To Approve Minors Compromise (transaction Id # 16067025) Filed By Petitioner Feng, Ying Chi On Behalf Of Minor Brian Wei Jian Feng
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
              Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (ying Chi Feng Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem For Brian Wei Jian Feng) (no Copy & Sase Provided) Filed By Petitioner Feng, Ying Chi On Behalf Of Minor Brian Wei Jian Feng
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 2 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                Fee Paid For Application For Gal Filed By Petitioner Feng, Ying Chi On Behalf Of Minor Brian Wei Jian Feng
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016
                  Petition For Compromise Of Claim Of Filed By Petitioner Feng, Ying Chi On Behalf Of Minor Brian Wei Jian Feng As To Claimant Feng, Brian Wei Jian Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                    Request RequestSpace

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 80 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?