Benjamin Hindson Et Al v. Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514769
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hindson, Benjamin, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth A. Howard +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7400 ehoward@orrick.com
Space Robert Scott Shwarts +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 rshwarts@orrick.com
No Logo Ness, Kevin, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth A. Howard +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7400 ehoward@orrick.com
Space Robert Scott Shwarts +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 rshwarts@orrick.com
No Logo Saxonov, Serge, Petitioner
Unknown Role, 10x Genomics, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth A. Howard +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7400 ehoward@orrick.com
Space Robert Scott Shwarts +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 rshwarts@orrick.com
v.
No Logo Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Patricia Thayer +1 415 772 6000 Patricia.Thayer@hellerehrman.com
No Logo Bio-rad Ql, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Patricia Thayer +1 415 772 6000 Patricia.Thayer@hellerehrman.com
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016
Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed (transaction Id # 58751235) Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: 3/10/2016 Text Judgment
    The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: Judgment Entered For Petitioners Benjamin Hindson, Kevin Ness, And Serge Saxonov And Against Respondents Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. And Bio-rad Ql, Inc. (see Judgment Confirmation Arbitration Award For Full Details.)
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 28 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Law And Motion 302, Respondents Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. And Bio-rad Ql., Inc.'s Motion To Place Under Seal The Exhibits To The Declaration Of Robert S. Shwarts In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment Is Granted In Part And Denied In Part. See Mini-minutes/order For Details. Order Signed. Judge: Harold Kahn, Clerk: Sean Kane, Not Reported. (302/hk)
        Blank 27 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Law And Motion 302, Petitioners Benjamin Hindson, Kevin Ness And Serge Saxonov's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment Is Granted. See Order For Full Text. Respondents Do Not Oppose The Petition. Order Signed. Judge: Harold Kahn, Clerk: Sean Kane, Not Reported. (302/hk)
          Blank 26 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Mini Minutes For Mar-09-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
            Blank 25 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Mini Minutes For Mar-09-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016
              Order Granting In Part And Denying In Part Respondents Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. And Bio-rad Ql, Inc.'s Motion To File Under Seal Exhibits To The Declaration Of Robert S. Shwarts In Support Of Petitin To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016
                Order Granting Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 Proof of Service
                  Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 58659294) Filed By Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016
                    Supplemental Declaration Of Jaime Bartlett In Support Of Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. And Bio-rad Ql, Inc. Reply In Support Of Motion To Place Under Seal The Exhibits To The Declaration Of Robert S. Shwarts In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 58659294) Filed By Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016
                      Reply In Support Of Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. And Bio-rad Ql, Inc. Motion To Place Under Seal The Exhibits To The Declaration Of Robert S. Shwarts In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 58659294) Filed By Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016
                        Response To Motion To Place Under Seal The Exhibits To The Declaration Of Robert S. Shwarts In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 58630557) Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016 Proof of Service
                          Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 58616454) Filed By Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016
                            Respondents Statement Of Non-opposition To Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 58616454) Filed By Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016 Proof of Service
                              Proof Of Service Motion To Seal And Supporting Documents (transaction Id # 58590432) Filed By Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 15 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 58590432) Filed By Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc.
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016
                                  Declaration Of Annette Tumolo In Support Of Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. And Bio-rad Ql, Inc.s Motion To Place Under Seal The Exhibits To The Declaration Of Robert S. Shwarts In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 58590432) Filed By Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc.
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016
                                    Declaration Of Jaime Bartlett In Support Of Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. And Bio-rad Ql, Inc.s Motion To Place Under Seal The Exhibits To The Declaration Of Robert S. Shwarts In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 58590432) Filed By Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016
                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. And Bio-rad Ql, Inc.s Motion To Place Under Seal The Exhibits To The Declaration Of Robert S. Shwarts In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 58590432) Filed By Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc.
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016
                                        Notice Of Motion And Motion To Place Under Seal The Exhibits To The Declaration Of Robert S. Shwarts In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 58590432) Filed By Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc. Hearing Set For Mar-09-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Proof Of Service By Electronic Means
                                          Proof Of Service By Electronic Mail (transaction Id # 58582649) Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 58582649) Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Ent
                                              Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 58582649) Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge Hearing Set For Mar-09-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Proof Of Service By Hand-delivery
                                                Proof Of Service By Hand Delivery (transaction Id # 58563639) Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                  Exhibit D To The Declaration Of Robert S. Shwarts In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (sealed Document) Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016
                                                    Declaration Of Robert S. Shwarts In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 58709683) Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Declaration
                                                      Declaration Of Robert S. Shwartz In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award/ Public Version (redacted) Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Notice
                                                        Notice Of Lodgment Of Documents Pursuant To Rule Of Court 2.551(b)(3) Re Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Notice
                                                          Notice Of Related Case Number Msc14-01751 Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                            Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Hindson, Benjamin Ness, Kevin Saxonov, Serge As To Respondent Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc. Bio-rad Ql, Inc. Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 297 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?