In Re: Tammy Wu
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514772
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chiang, Liting, Plaintiff
No Logo Chiang, Liting, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Strick Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schnasse, Nestor R +1 415 721 1200
No Logo Wu, Tammy, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strick Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schnasse, Nestor R +1 415 721 1200
Cause of Action Petition For Compromise Of Claim
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Uncontested Calendar Of Sep-22-2016 Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account Continued To Dec-15-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514 Per Request Of Moving Party Nestor Schnasse, Esq For Filing Of Receipt. (514)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016
    Declaration Of Nestor R. Schnasse In Re: Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment (transaction Id # 100003221) Filed By Claimant Wu, Tammy
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 14 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Added To Calendar For Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account Hearing Set For Sep-22-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016
        Order To Deposit Money Into Blocked Account
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016
          Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim Of Minor
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 11 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
            *** Fee Pd *** Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (transaction Id # 100019705) Filed By Claimant Wu, Tammy
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016
              Petition Expedited Petition To Approve Compromise Of Disputed Claim (transaction Id # 100019705) Filed By Claimant Wu, Tammy
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 Substitution of Attorney
                Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 100019702): Schnasse, Nestor R Substituted For Pro Per As Attorney For Chiang, Liting
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
                  Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (liting Chiang Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem For Tammy Wu) (no Sase Provided; Copy In Dept 206 Outbox) Filed By Plaintiff Chiang, Liting
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Uncontested Calendar Of May-17-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party. Nestor R. Schnasse, Esq., Specially Appearing With Petitioner Liting Chiang. Expedited Petition Lodged With Court. Judge: Joseph M. Quinn, Clerk: A. Mok. Proceedings Reported By Csr: Mitch Lyon, Csr#6840. (514)
                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: 4/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      Fee Paid On Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem--civil (transaction Id # 58894165) Filed By Petitioner Chiang, Liting
                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Uncontested Calendar Of Apr-05-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Continued To May-17-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514. Petitioner Liting Chiang Appearing On Her Own Behalf. Kenneth I. Litton, Esq., Appearing For Insurance Company. Judge: Joseph M. Quinn, Clerk: A. Mok. Proceedings Reported By Csr: Mitch Lyon, Csr#6840. (514)
                          Blank 4 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                          Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (transaction Id # 58804941) Filed By Petitioner Chiang, Liting
                            Blank 3 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Petitioner Chiang, Liting
                              Blank 2 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                              Motion For Compromise Of Claim Filed By Petitioner Chiang, Liting Hearing Set For Apr-05-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016
                                Petition For Compromise Of Claim Of Minor Filed By Petitioner Chiang, Liting As To Claimant Wu, Tammy Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                  Request RequestSpace

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?