In Re: Malcolm Tulau
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514773
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tulau, Lise, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Hardiman & Carroll

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy Marie Schenk +1 415 248 3930 wschenk@sflawfirm.com
No Logo Tulau, Malcolm, Claimant
Cause of Action Petition For Compromise Of Claim
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
Uncontested Calendar Of Oct-27-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Transferred To Miscellaneous Special Setting Calendar On Oct-27-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 206 For Reassignment.
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
    Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (lise Tulau Is Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem For Minor Malcolm Tulau) Filed By Petitioner Tulau, Lise
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 13 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Uncontested Calendar Of Sep-15-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Continued To Oct-27-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514 For Guardian Ad Litem Order. Counsel Notified By Phone. (514)
        Blank 12 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Uncontested Calendar Of Aug-16-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Continued To Sep-15-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514 Per Court's Own Motion For Guardian Ad Litem Order. (514)
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016
          Amended Petition To Approve: Compromise Of Disputed Claim Of Minor (transaction Id # 100001459) Filed By Petitioner Tulau, Lise
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 10 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/20/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Uncontested Calendar Of Jul-21-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Continued To Aug-16-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514 Per Request Of Moving Party For Guardian Ad Litem Order. No Appearances. (514)
              Blank 9 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Fee Paid For Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (transaction Id # 59282453) Filed By Petitioner Tulau, Lise
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Substitution of Attorney
                Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 59282421): Schenk, Wendy W Substituted For Pro Per As Attorney For Tulau, Lise
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Uncontested Calendar Of Jun-23-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Continued To Jul-21-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514 For Per Request Of Moving Party For Guardian Ad Litem Order. No Appearances. (514)
                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: 5/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Uncontested Calendar Of May-17-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Continued To Jun-23-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514 Per Request Of Moving Party. No Appearances. (514)
                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Uncontested Calendar Of Apr-07-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Continued To May-17-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514 Per Request Of Moving Party. Judge: Joseph M. Quinn, Clerk: A. Mok. Proceedings (514)
                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (transaction Id # 58804751) Filed By Petitioner Tulau, Lise
                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                          Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Petitioner Tulau, Lise
                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                            Motion For Compromise Of Claim Filed By Petitioner Tulau, Lise Hearing Set For Apr-07-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016
                              Petition For Compromise Of Claim Of Minor Filed By Petitioner Tulau, Lise As To Claimant Tulau, Malcolm Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                Request RequestSpace

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 132 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?