In Re: Leonardo Balladares Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514774
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Balladares, Blanca, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Anna Dubrovsky Law Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dubrovsky, Anna +1 650 327 1300
No Logo Balladares, Gisselle, Claimant
No Logo Balladares, Leonardo, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anna Dubrovsky Law Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dubrovsky, Anna +1 650 327 1300
No Logo Balladares, Marbella, Claimant
Cause of Action Petition For Compromise Of Claim
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (9) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
Uncontested Calendar Of Aug-23-2016 Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into A Blocked Account For Minor Leonardo Balladares Off Calendar. Receipt On File. (514)
    Blank 28 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
    Uncontested Calendar Of Aug-23-2016 Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into A Blocked Account For Minor Gisselle Balladares Off Calendar. Receipt On File. (514)
      Blank 27 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Uncontested Calendar Of Aug-23-2016 Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into A Blocked Account For Minor Marbella Balladares Off Calendar. Receipt On File. (514)
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016
        Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account (for Gisselle Balladares) (transaction Id # 59172576) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016
          Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account (for Marbella Balladares) (transaction Id # 59172576) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016
            Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account (for Leonardo Balladares) (transaction Id # 59172576) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 23 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Added To Calendar For Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into A Blocked Account For Minor Marbella Balladares Hearing Set For Aug-23-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
                Blank 22 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                Added To Calendar For Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into A Blocked Account For Minor Leonardo Balladares Hearing Set For Aug-23-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
                  Blank 21 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Added To Calendar For Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into A Blocked Account For Minor Gisselle Balladares Hearing Set For Aug-23-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016
                    Order To Deposit Money Into Blocked Account For Minor Leonardo Balladares
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016
                      Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim For Minor Leonardo Balladares
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016
                        Order To Deposit Money Into Blocked Account For Minor Gisselle Balladares
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016
                          Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim For Minor Gisselle Balladares
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016
                            Order To Deposit Money Into Blocked Account For Minor Marbella Balladares
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016
                              Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim For Minor Marbella Balladares
                                Blank 14 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Uncontested Calendar Of May-12-2016, Notice Of Hearing Of Petition To Approve A Compromise Of A Disputed Claim Granted Per Written Order. Pavel Krepkiy, Esq., Appearing For Petitioner Blanca Balladares. Judge: Joseph M. Quinn, Clerk: A. Mok. Proceedings Reported By Csr: Mitch Lyon, Csr#6840. (514)
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                  Mini Minutes For May-12-2016 09:00 Am For Dept 514
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
                                    Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (blanca Balladares Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem For Gisselle Balladares) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
                                      Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (blanca Balladares Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem For Leonardo Balladares) Filed By Claimant Balladares, Leonardo
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
                                        Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (blanca Balladares Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem For Marbella Balladares) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                          Fee For Application And Proposed Order - Gal - Gisselle Balladares (transaction Id # 58773509) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                            Fee For Application And Proposed Order - Gal - Leonardo Balladares (transaction Id # 58773509) Filed By Claimant Balladares, Leonardo
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                              Fee For Application And Proposed Order - Gal - Marbella Balladares (transaction Id # 58773509) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 58757107) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016
                                                  Notice Of Hearing Of Petition To Approve A Compromise Of A Disputed Claim (transaction Id # 58757107) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca Hearing Set For May-12-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                    Fee Paid On Application And Proposed Order - Guardian Ad Litem - Leonardo Balladares (transaction Id # 58610994) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                      Fee Paid On Application And Proposed Order - Guardian Ad Litem - Gisselle Balladares (transaction Id # 58610994) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                        Fee Paid On Application And Proposed Order - Guardian Ad Litem - Marbella Balladares (transaction Id # 58610994) Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016
                                                          Petition For Compromise Of Claim Of Minor Filed By Petitioner Balladares, Blanca As To Claimant Balladares, Leonardo Balladares, Gisselle Balladares, Marbella Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                                            Request RequestSpace

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 141 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?