Hanson Bridgett, v. Muriel Monson
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514812
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hanson Bridgett, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Glassberg, Pollak & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Davis Klavdianos +1 415 291 8320
v.
No Logo Monson, Muriel Individually And As Trustee Of The Muriel Monson Trust, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: 6/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County As To Respondent Monson, Muriel Individually And As Trustee Of The Muriel Monson Trust
    Blank 15 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: 6/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
    Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Petitioner Hanson Bridgett,
      Blank 14 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: 6/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Petitioner Hanson Bridgett,
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 Memorandum Of Costs
        Memorandum Of Costs And Disbursements, $615.50 Total Costs, Mature Date Jun-21-2016,, (transaction Id # 59082578) Filed By Petitioner Hanson Bridgett,
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016
          Notice Of Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 59059093)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: 5/20/2016 Court Judgment - General
            The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Petitioner Hanson Bridgett, Recover From Respondent Monson, Muriel Individually And As Trustee Of The Muriel Monson Trust $169,319.13 Principal, $2,825.00 Attorney Fees, $3,757.59 Interest, Total Judgment $175,901.72, See Scanned Doc
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Hanson Bridgett's Petition And Motion To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. Order Signed. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976.
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016
                Order Granting Plaintiff's Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Mini Minutes For Apr-26-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016
                    Proof Of Service Re Petition And Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 58750904) Filed By Petitioner Hanson Bridgett,
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 58682322) Filed By Petitioner Hanson Bridgett,
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Declaration In Support Of Interest Calculation
                        Declaration In Support Of Interest Calculation (transaction Id # 58682322) Filed By Petitioner Hanson Bridgett,
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016
                          Declaration Of Denis Klavdianos In Support Of Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 58682322) Filed By Petitioner Hanson Bridgett,
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016
                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 58682322) Filed By Petitioner Hanson Bridgett,
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016
                              Notice Of Hearing On Petition And Motion To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 58682322) Filed By Petitioner Hanson Bridgett, Hearing Set For Apr-26-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Hanson Bridgett, As To Respondent Monson, Muriel Individually And As Trustee Of The Muriel Monson Trust Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                  Request RequestSpace

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 203 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?