Union Terrace v. Linda Cahill Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514828
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Union Terrace, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark S. Posard +1 415 986 5900 +1 415 986 8054 mposard@gordonrees.com
v.
No Logo Cahill, Linda, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Gill, John Philip

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hughes, Michael Jeffrey +1 510 947 6040
No Logo Horio, James, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Gill, John Philip

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hughes, Michael Jeffrey +1 510 947 6040
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 Acknowledgment Of Satisfaction Of Judgment
Satisfaction Of Judgment, Fully Satisfied, (transaction Id # 59581606) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace As To Respondent Cahill, Linda
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Notice of Entry of Judgment
    Notice Of Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 59478987) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
      Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/20/2016 Court Judgment - General
      The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Petitioner Union Terrace Recover From Respondent Cahill, Linda $25,127.82 Fees And Costs, Total Judgment $25,127.82, See Scanned Doc
        Blank 23 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Union Terrace's Motion For Fees And Costs Is Granted As To Respondent Linda Cahill And Denied As To Respondent James Horio. Union Terrace Is Entitled To Fees And Costs Of $25,127.82 Against Ms. Cahill Per The Bylaws, Which Are Incorporated By Reference In The Lease Signed By The Parties. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Not Reported.
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 Notice of Entry of Order
          Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed (transaction Id # 59075134) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
            Blank 21 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Mini Minutes For May-31-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
              Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016
              Order Granting Petitioner Union Terrace's Motion For Fees And Costs
                Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016
                Reply (transaction Id # 59048362) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016
                  Opposition Of Respondent Linda Cahill To Petitioner Motion For Attorneys Fees (transaction Id # 59021263) Filed By Respondent Cahill, Linda Horio, James
                    Blank 17 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: 5/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 58971494) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: 5/6/2016
                      Declaration Of David L. Jordan In Support Of Petitioner Union Terrances Motion For Fees And Costs (transaction Id # 58971494) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: 5/6/2016
                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petitioner Union Terrances Motion For Fees And Costs (transaction Id # 58971494) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: 5/6/2016
                          Notice Of Motion In Support Of Petitioner Union Terrances Motion For Fees And Costs (transaction Id # 58971494) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace Hearing Set For May-31-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Notice of Entry of Judgment
                            Notice Of Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 58915982)
                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Notice of Entry of Order
                              Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed (transaction Id # 58915982) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: 4/20/2016 Text Judgment
                                The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: Judgment For Petitioner Union Terrace Against Respondents Linda Cahill And James Horio. See Scanned Document
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Union Terrace's Petition For Confirmation Of Arbitration Decision Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn, Clerk: Sean Kane, Not Reported. (302/hk)
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                    Mini Minutes For Mar-29-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016
                                      Order Confirming Final Arbitration Decision
                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016 Proof of Service
                                        Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 58706206) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                          Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 58679195) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016
                                            Declaration Of Peter Marshall In Support Of Union Terrace Petition For Confirmation Of Final Arbitration Decision (transaction Id # 58679195) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016
                                              Declaration Of David Jordan In Support Of Union Terrace Petition For Confirmation Of Final Arbitration Decision (transaction Id # 58679195) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016
                                                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration (transaction Id # 58679195) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace
                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016
                                                  Notice Of Petition And Petition For Confirmation Of Arbitration Decision (transaction Id # 58679195) Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace Hearing Set For Mar-29-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                    Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Union Terrace As To Respondent Cahill, Linda Horio, James Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 978 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?