In Re: Maxwell Hand
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514831
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hand, Jasper , Guardian Ad Litem For Minor, Maxwell Hand, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Scherer Smith & Kenny LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denis Sullivan Kenny +1 415 433 1099 +1 415 433 9434 denis@sfcounsel.com
No Logo Hand, Maxwell, Claimant
Cause of Action Petition For Compromise Of Claim
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: 7/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
Uncontested Calendar Of Jul-26-2016 Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into A Structured Annuity Off Calendar. Proof Of Deposit Of Money Into An Annuity Filed. No Appearances. (514)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016
    Declaration Of Ryan W. Stahl Regarding May 12, 2016, Court Order (transaction Id # 100022247) Filed By Petitioner Hand, Jasper , Guardian Ad Litem For Minor, Maxwell Hand
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016
      Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim For Minor Maxwell Hand
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Added To Calendar For Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into A Structured Annuity Hearing Set For Jul-26-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
          Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Uncontested Calendar Of Apr-26-2016, Motion For Compromise Of Claim Granted Per Written Order. Denis Sullivan Kenny, Esq., Appearing For Petitioner Jasper Hand. Judge: Joseph M. Quinn, Clerk: A. Mok. Proceedings Reported By Csr: Mitch Lyon, Csr#6840. (514)
            Blank 8 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Mini Minutes For Apr-26-2016 09:00 Am For Dept 514
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Declaration
              Declaration Of Denis S. Kenny In Support Of Attorneys' Fees And Costs Re: Petition To Approve Compromise Of Disputed Claim For Minor [attachment 14a] Filed By Petitioner Hand, Jasper , Guardian Ad Litem For Minor, Maxwell Hand
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
                Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (jasper Hand Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem For Maxwell Hand) Filed By Claimant Hand, Maxwell
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Uncontested Calendar Of Mar-24-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Continued To Apr-26-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514 Per Request Of Moving Party Denis S. Kenny, Esq. (514)
                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Fee Paid On Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (transaction Id # 100015295) Filed By Petitioner Hand, Jasper , Guardian Ad Litem For Minor, Maxwell Hand
                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Petitioner Hand, Jasper , Guardian Ad Litem For Minor, Maxwell Hand
                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        Motion For Compromise Of Claim Filed By Petitioner Hand, Jasper , Guardian Ad Litem For Minor, Maxwell Hand Hearing Set For Mar-24-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016
                          Petition For Compromise Of Claim Of Minor Filed By Petitioner Hand, Jasper , Guardian Ad Litem For Minor, Maxwell Hand As To Claimant Hand, Maxwell Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                            Request RequestSpace

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 135 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?