In Re: Haris Bukaric
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514834
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bukaric, Haris A Minor By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem, Izet Bukaric, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Vitaly Lipovetsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lipovetsky, Vitaly +1 415 397 9300
No Logo Bukaric, Haris, Claimant
Cause of Action Petition For Compromise Of Claim
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
Uncontested Calendar Of Jul-19-2016 Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account Off Calendar. Receipt On File. (514)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016
    Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account (transaction Id # 100021532) Filed By Petitioner Bukaric, Haris A Minor By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem, Izet Bukaric
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 6 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Added To Calendar For Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account Hearing Set For Jul-19-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016
        Order To Deposit Money Into Blocked Account
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016
          Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
            Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (izet Bukaric Is Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem For Minor Haris Bukaric) Filed By Petitioner Bukaric, Haris A Minor By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem, Izet Bukaric
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 2 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Fee Paid For Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem Filed By Petitioner Bukaric, Haris A Minor By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem, Izet Bukaric
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016
                Petition For Compromise Of Claim Of Minor Filed By Petitioner Bukaric, Haris A Minor By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem, Izet Bukaric As To Claimant Bukaric, Haris Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                  Request RequestSpace

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 63 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?