Rachel Blaney v. Black Sterling Friesians, Inc., A California
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514903
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Blaney, Rachel, Plaintiff
No Logo Blaney, Rachel, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Fitzgerald Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Scott MacKay +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1527 amackay@donahue.com
v.
No Logo Black Sterling Friesians, Inc., A California Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Black Sterling Friesians, Inc., A California Corporation, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: 8/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Plaintiff Blaney, Rachel
    Blank 12 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Rachel Blaney's Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Fees And Costs Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. Order And Separate Judgment Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Not Reported.
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Court Judgment - General
      The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Petitioner Blaney, Rachel Recover From Respondent Black Sterling Friesians, Inc., A California Corporation $3,580.00 Principal, $56,713.00 Attorney Fees, $915.75 Costs, Total Judgment $61,208.75, Plus 10% Per Annum Interest On Principal Until Paid - See Scanned Doc
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016
        Order Confirming Arbitration Award And Fees And Costs
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 9 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Mini Minutes For May-27-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016
            Proof Of Service - Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Fees And Costs (transaction Id # 58956899) Filed By Petitioner Blaney, Rachel
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 7 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 58956899) Filed By Petitioner Blaney, Rachel
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016
                Declaration Of Andrew S. Mackay In Support Of Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Fees And Costs (transaction Id # 58956899) Filed By Petitioner Blaney, Rachel
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016
                  Notice Of Motion And Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Fees And Costs (transaction Id # 58956899) Filed By Petitioner Blaney, Rachel Hearing Set For May-27-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Entry Of Default Reject
                    Request For Default Rejected, E-filing Reject, (transaction Id # 58935868) Submitted By Petitioner Blaney, Rachel As To Respondent Black Sterling Friesians, Inc., A California Corporation
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: 4/29/2016 Entry Of Default Reject
                      Request For Default Rejected, E-filing Reject, (transaction Id # 58935387) Submitted By Plaintiff Blaney, Rachel As To Defendant Black Sterling Friesians, Inc., A California Corporation
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Proof of Service of Summons
                        Proof Of Service Of Proof Of Service Of Summons (transaction Id # 58777992) Filed By Petitioner Blaney, Rachel Served Mar-18-2016, Substitute Service On Natural Person As To Respondent Black Sterling Friesians, Inc., A California Corporation
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                          Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Blaney, Rachel As To Respondent Black Sterling Friesians, Inc., A California Corporation Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 524 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?