People Of The State Of California v. American Surety Company
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514913
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo People of the State of California, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by City Attorney (city Hall, Rm 234)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space City Attorney +1 415 554 4620
v.
No Logo American Surety Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adam Sostrin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Sostrin +1 714 617 9600
No Logo The Bail Hotline Bail Bonds, Real Party In Interest

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew J. Singer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Jason Singer +1 312 431 0888 singer.matthewj@gmail.com
Cause of Action Summary Judgment
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Defendant American Surety Company's Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgment, Discharge Forfeiture And Exonerate Bail Is Granted. No Oppositon Filed And Good Cause Shown. Bail Will Be Exonerated And $40,450 Refunded To Bail Hotline Bail Bonds. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Richard Ulmer. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976.
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016
    Order To Set Aside Summary Judgment, Discharge Forfeiture And Exonerate Bail And Reimbursement Of Monies And Interest Of Judgment Paid
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 13 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Mini Minutes For May-17-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
        Blank 12 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: 5/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
        *** Fee Pd *** Stipulation To Set Aside Summary Judgment And Order (transaction Id # 16125024) Filed By Defendant American Surety Company
          Blank 11 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 16116007) Filed By Defendant American Surety Company
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Set Aside Mtn For Summ Judgmnt (transaction Id # 16116007) Filed By Defendant American Surety Company
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Proof of Service
              Proof Of Service Of Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgmnt (transaction Id # 16116007) Filed By Defendant American Surety Company
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016
                Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgment, Discharge Forfeiture And Exonerate Bail (transaction Id # 16116007) Filed By Defendant American Surety Company Hearing Set For May-17-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 7 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: 4/18/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Law And Motion Dept. 302: Real Party In Interest The Bail Hotline Bail Bonds' Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgment Is Off Calendar. Not Filed And Served In Compliance With Ccp 1005. See Minutes. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976.
                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: 4/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Mini Minutes For Apr-18-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 100017734) Filed By Real Party In Interest The Bail Hotline Bail Bonds
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 100017734) Filed By Real Party In Interest The Bail Hotline Bail Bonds
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016
                          Notice Of Motion And Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 100017734) Filed By Real Party In Interest The Bail Hotline Bail Bonds Hearing Set For Apr-18-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                            Under Application To The Clerk For Summary Judgment, It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff People Of The State Of California Recover From Defendant American Surety Company $40,000.00 Principal, $450.00 Filing Fees, Total Judgment $40,450.00, See Scanned Judgment For Terms
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                              Summary Judgment Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California As To Defendant American Surety Company Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                Request RequestSpace

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?