Global Biopharmaceutical Regulations, Inc. Et Al v. Immunoscience, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514926
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Global Biopharmaceutical Regulations, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of James N. Knight

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James N. Knight +1 949 502 6999
No Logo Raval, Ruchika, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of James N. Knight

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James N. Knight +1 949 502 6999
v.
No Logo Immunoscience, Inc., Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: 5/6/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Petitioners Global Biopharmaceutical Regulations And Ruchika Raval's Petition And Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award Is Off Calendar. The Case Was Dismissed On April 12, 2016. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976.
    Blank 7 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: 5/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
    Mini Minutes For May-06-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 Dismissal
      Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice (transaction Id # 100017540)
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 Proof of Service
        Proof Of Service Of Notice Of Petition And Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 100016895) Filed By Petitioner Global Biopharmaceutical Regulations, Inc. Raval, Ruchika
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Declaration
          Declaration Of Ruchika Raval In Support Of Petition And Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Global Biopharmaceutical Regulations, Inc. Raval, Ruchika
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 3 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Petitioner Global Biopharmaceutical Regulations, Inc. Raval, Ruchika
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Motion (civil Generic)
              Notice Of Petition And Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award, Points And Authorities Filed By Petitioner Global Biopharmaceutical Regulations, Inc. Raval, Ruchika Hearing Set For May-06-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Global Biopharmaceutical Regulations, Inc. Raval, Ruchika As To Respondent Immunoscience, Inc. Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 135 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?