In Re: Nagmaddin Homran
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514949
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Homran, Hifdallah Ahmed, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Eric M. Safire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Mitchell Safire +1 415 292 1940 +1 415 292 1946 eric@safirelaw.com
No Logo Homran, Nagmaddin, Claimant
Cause of Action Petition For Compromise Of Claim
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
Uncontested Calendar Of Sep-01-2016 Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into An Annuity Off Calendar. Proof Of Purchase Of Annuity On File. No Appearances Required. (514)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016
    Declaration Of Eric M. Safire Regarding The Minors Settlement Funds Established In A Guaranteed Annuity Policy (transaction Id # 59444789) Filed By Petitioner Homran, Hifdallah Ahmed
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 10 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Added To Calendar For Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into An Annuity. Hearing Set For Sep-01-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016
        Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim Of Minor
          Blank 8 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Uncontested Calendar Of Jun-02-2016, Motion For Compromise Of Claim Granted Per Written Order. Eric M. Safire, Esq., Appearing For Petitioner: Hifdallah Homran, Father And Guardian Ad Litem For Minor: Nagmaddin Homran Present In Court. Judge: Joseph M. Quinn, Clerk: A. Mok. Proceedings Reported By Csr: Mitch Lyon, Csr#6840. (514)
            Blank 7 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Mini Minutes For Jun-02-2016 09:00 Am For Dept 514
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016
              Declaration Of Eric M. Safire In Support Of Request For Attorney Fees (transaction Id # 59081348) Filed By Petitioner Homran, Hifdallah Ahmed
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: 4/29/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
                Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (hifdallah Ahmed Homran Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem For Nagmaddin Homran) Filed By Petitioner Homran, Hifdallah Ahmed
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem/ Minor - Nagmaddin Homran Filed By Petitioner Homran, Hifdallah Ahmed
                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Petitioner Homran, Hifdallah Ahmed
                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      Motion For Compromise Of Claim Filed By Petitioner Homran, Hifdallah Ahmed Hearing Set For Jun-02-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016
                        Petition For Compromise Of Claim Of Minor Filed By Petitioner Homran, Hifdallah Ahmed As To Claimant Homran, Nagmaddin Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 54 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?