Brian Bennett v. Nissim Lanyadoo
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514956
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bennett, Brian, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Spector & Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ross Adam Spector +1 415 439 5390 +1 415 707 2064 ross.spector@spectorandbennett.com
No Logo Lanyadoo, Nissim, Respondent
No Logo Trujillo, Michael, Third Party
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (7) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Order Of Examination Issued
Order Of Examination Issued Filed By Petitioner Bennett, Brian As To Third Party Trujillo, Michael Oex Hearing Set For Dec-08-2016 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 514
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016
    Declaration Of Ross A. Spector In Support Of Application And Order For Appearance And Examination Of Third Person (transaction Id # 100023847) Filed By Petitioner Bennett, Brian
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 12 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Petitioner Bennett, Brian
        Blank 11 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Petitioner Bennett, Brian
          Blank 10 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Petitioner Bennett, Brian
            Blank 9 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Petitioner Bennett, Brian
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Substitution of Attorney
              Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 100022670): Spector, Ross Adam Substituted For Sharma, Kavita As Attorney For Bennett, Brian
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: 5/24/2016 Court Judgment - General
                The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Petitioner Bennett, Brian Recover From Respondent Lanyadoo, Nissim $142,174.22 Principal, $4,719.50 Attorney Fees, $2,251.09 Interest, $115.00 Costs, Total Judgment $149,259.81, See Scanned Doc
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: 5/24/2016
                  Order Confirming Arbitration Award
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016
                    Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Petitioners Ex Parte Application For Confirmation Of Arbitration Award And Entry Of Judgment Against Nissim Lanyadoo (transaction Id # 59025698) Filed By Petitioner Bennett, Brian
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016
                      Declaration Of Kavita Sharma In Support Of Petitioners Ex Parte Application For Confirmation Of Arbitration Award And Entry Of Judgment Against Nissim Lanyadoo (transaction Id # 59025698) Filed By Petitioner Bennett, Brian
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016
                        Ex Parte Application For Order For Confirmation Of Arbitration Award And Entry Of Judgment Against Nissim Lanyadoo (transaction Id # 59025698) Filed By Petitioner Bennett, Brian
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Proof of Service of Summons
                          Proof Of Service Of Summons (transaction Id # 59000138) Filed By Petitioner Bennett, Brian Served Apr-26-2016, Mail As To Respondent Lanyadoo, Nissim
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                            Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Bennett, Brian As To Respondent Lanyadoo, Nissim Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 409 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?