In Re: Jacky Ye
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514957
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Huang, Bonnie, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari Werner & Moriarty

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis F. Moriarty +1 415 391 1113 +1 415 391 4626
No Logo Ye, Jacky, Claimant
Cause of Action Petition For Compromise Of Claim
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
Uncontested Calendar Of Sep-13-2016 Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account Off Calendar. Receipt On File. No Appearances Required. (514)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Bloc
    Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account (transaction Id # 59360580)
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 10 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Added To Calendar For Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account Hearing Set For Sep-13-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016
        Order To Deposit Money Into Blocked Account
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016
          Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 7 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Uncontested Calendar Of Jun-07-2016, Motion For Compromise Of Claim Granted Per Written Order. Stephen L. Dahm, Esq., Appearing For Petitioner Bonnie Huang. Judge: Joseph M. Quinn, Clerk: A. Mok. Proceedings Reported By Csr: Mitch Lyon, Csr#6840. (514)
              Blank 6 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Mini Minutes For Jun-07-2016 09:00 Am For Dept 514
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
                Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (bonnie Huang Is Appointed As The Guardian Ad Litem For Minor Jacky Ye) Filed By Petitioner Huang, Bonnie
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: 4/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem/ Minor Jacky Ye Filed By Petitioner Huang, Bonnie
                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: 4/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Petitioner Huang, Bonnie
                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: 4/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      Motion For Compromise Of Claim Filed By Petitioner Huang, Bonnie Hearing Set For Jun-07-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: 4/18/2016
                        Petition For Compromise Of Claim Of Minor Filed By Petitioner Huang, Bonnie As To Claimant Ye, Jacky Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                          Request RequestSpace

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 141 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?