Goldman, Sachs & Co. v. Dhruv Khanna Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514971
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Petitioner
Officially listed as "Goldman, Sachs & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick P. Gunn +1 415 693 2000 +1 415 693 2222 pgunn@cooley.com
v.
No Logo Degan, Surita, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Ram Olson Cereghino and Kopczynski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl Olson +1 415 433 4949 +1 415 433 7311 ko@lrolaw.com
No Logo Gopisetty, Sandeep As Trustee Of The Khanna Children's Irrevocable Trust, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Ram Olson Cereghino and Kopczynski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl Olson +1 415 433 4949 +1 415 433 7311 ko@lrolaw.com
No Logo Khanna, Dhruv , Individually And As Trustee Of The 1999 Dhruv Khanna Charitable Trust, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Ram Olson Cereghino and Kopczynski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl Olson +1 415 433 4949 +1 415 433 7311 ko@lrolaw.com
No Logo The Khanna Children's Irrevocable Trust, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Ram Olson Cereghino and Kopczynski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl Olson +1 415 433 4949 +1 415 433 7311 ko@lrolaw.com
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: 6/30/2016 Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order Granting Petition To Confirm Arb Award (transaction Id # 100022120) Filed By Petitioner Goldman, Sachs & Co.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 13 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Goldman, Sachs & Company's Petition For Order Confirming Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment Is Granted. Respondents Filed A Conditional Non-opposition To The Petition. Order And A Separate Judgment Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Not Reported.
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 Text Judgment
      The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award - See Scanned Document
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 11 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Mini Minutes For Jun-01-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016
          Order Granting Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016
            Proof Of Service Of Petitioners Submission Of A Revised [proposed] Order Confirming Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 100020262) Filed By Petitioner Goldman, Sachs & Co.
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016
              Submission Of A Revised [proposed] Order Confirming Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 100020262) Filed By Petitioner Goldman, Sachs & Co.
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016
                Conditional Non-opposition To Petition (transaction Id # 59033494) Filed By Respondent Khanna, Dhruv , Individually And As Trustee Of The 1999 Dhruv Khanna Charitable Trust The Khanna Children's Irrevocable Trust Gopisetty, Sandeep As Trustee Of The Khanna Children's Irrevocable Trust Degan, Surita
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: 4/27/2016
                  Proof Of Service Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 100018522) Filed By Petitioner Goldman, Sachs & Co.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Petitioner Goldman, Sachs & Co.
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Declaration
                      Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Petitioner Goldman, Sachs & Co.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed By Petitioner Goldman, Sachs & Co.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Motion (civil Generic)
                          Notice Of Hearing On Petition For Order Confirming Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment Filed By Petitioner Goldman, Sachs & Co. Hearing Set For Jun-01-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                            Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Goldman, Sachs & Co. As To Respondent Khanna, Dhruv , Individually And As Trustee Of The 1999 Dhruv Khanna Charitable Trust The Khanna Children's Irrevocable Trust Gopisetty, Sandeep As Trustee Of The Khanna Children's Irrevocable Trust Degan, Surita Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                              Request RequestSpace

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 179 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?