The People Of The State Of California v. Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514979
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo The People Of The State Of California, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by City and County of San Francisco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Of San Francisco, City And County +1 415 553 9392
v.
No Logo Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorneys at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M Rorabaugh +1 559 227 2373
Cause of Action Summary Judgment
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016
Amended Proof Of Service Of Electronic Service To John M. Rorabaugh For: Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgment, Discharge Forfeiture And Exonerate Bail; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 59320028) Filed By Plaintiff The People Of The State Of California
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016
    Proof Of Electronic Service Of: Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgment, Discharge Forfeiture And Exonerate Bail; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 59319498) Filed By Plaintiff The People Of The State Of California
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 12 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Law And Motion 302, Defendant Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc.'s Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgment, Discharge Forfeiture And Exonerate Bail Is Granted (see Order For Full Text). A Written Order Is Signed And Filed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976. (d302)
        Blank 11 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Mini Minutes For Jul-12-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016
          Order To Set Aside Summary Judgment And Exonerate Bail
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: 7/7/2016 Proof of Service
            Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 16187047) Filed By Defendant Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc.
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: 7/7/2016 Reply Brief
              Reply Brief (transaction Id # 16187047) Filed By Defendant Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc.
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: 6/24/2016
                Opposition To Defendants Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgment, Discharge Forfeiture And Exonerate Bail; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 59191014) Filed By Plaintiff The People Of The State Of California
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                  Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Ofmotion (transaction Id # 16153014) Filed By Defendant Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Proof of Service
                    Proof Of Service Of Notice Of Motion And Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgment, Discharge Forfeiture And Exonerate Bail; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Ofmotion (transaction Id # 16153014) Filed By Defendant Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016
                      Notice Of Motion And Motion To Set Aside Summary Judgment, Discharge Forfeiture And Exonerate Bail (transaction Id # 16153014) Filed By Defendant Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc. Hearing Set For Jul-12-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 3 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 16153014) Filed By Defendant Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc.
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                          Under Application To The Clerk For Summary Judgment, It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff The People Of The State Of California Recover From Defendant Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc. $25,000.00 Principal, $450.00 Costs, Total Judgment $25,450.00, See Scanned Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                            Summary Judgment Filed By Plaintiff The People Of The State Of California As To Defendant Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc. Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                              Request RequestSpace

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 113 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?