Swift Financial Corporation Dba Swift Capital v. Total Body Concept, Inc. Dba Always Tan Skin And B
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 514981
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Swift Financial Corporation Dba Swift Capital, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Murchison & Cummings, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew K Winsinki +1 415 391 7111
v.
No Logo Total Body Concept, Inc. Dba Always Tan Skin And Body, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/22/2016 Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 59181960)
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016 Court Judgment - General
    The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Petitioner Swift Financial Corporation Dba Swift Capital Recover From Respondent Total Body Concept, Inc. Dba Always Tan Skin And Body $49,854.91 Principal, $2,270.11 Interest, $495.00 Costs, Total Judgment $52,620.02, See Scanned Doc
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016
      Order Confirming Arbitration Award
        Blank 6 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Mini Minutes For Jun-20-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Blank 5 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Swift Financial Corporation's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. Order And A Separate Judgment Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Not Reported.
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: 5/20/2016
            Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 59041743), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Petitioner Swift Financial Corporation Dba Swift Capital Served May-13-2016, Personal Service On Respondent Total Body Concept, Inc. Dba Always Tan Skin And Body
              Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59005484) Filed By Petitioner Swift Financial Corporation Dba Swift Capital
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016
                Notice Of Hearing Re Confirming Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59005484) Filed By Petitioner Swift Financial Corporation Dba Swift Capital Hearing Set For Jun-20-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                  Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Swift Financial Corporation Dba Swift Capital As To Respondent Total Body Concept, Inc. Dba Always Tan Skin And Body Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 253 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?