In Re: Lia Elbaranes
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515016
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elbaranes-koll, Eva, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by O'connor, Runckel & O'malley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Oliver Runckel +1 925 939 5600 +1 925 939 5602 jason@orolawfirm.com
No Logo Elbaranes, Lia, Claimant
Cause of Action Petition For Compromise Of Claim
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: 8/22/2016
Receipt And Acknowledgement Of Order For Deposit Of Money Into Settlement Annuity Policy (transaction Id # 59452771) Filed By Petitioner Elbaranes-koll, Eva
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 5 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
    Added To Calendar For Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into An Annuity Hearing Set For Nov-03-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016
      Order Approving Compromise Of Disputed Claim Of A Minor
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: 7/19/2016 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
        Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (eva Elbaranes-koll Is Appointed Guardian Ad Litem For Lia Elbaranes) Filed By Petitioner Elbaranes-koll, Eva
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 2 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Fee Paid On: Ex Parte Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (transaction Id # 59093887) Filed By Petitioner Elbaranes-koll, Eva
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: 5/11/2016
            Petition For Compromise Of Claim Of Minor Filed By Petitioner Elbaranes-koll, Eva As To Claimant Elbaranes, Lia Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
              Request RequestSpace

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 67 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?