Emcore Corporation A New Jersey Corporation v. Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd A Japanese Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515025
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Emcore Corporation A New Jersey Corporation, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
v.
No Logo Sumitomo Electric Device Innovations Usa, Inc., A A Delaware Corporation, Respondent
No Logo Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd A Japanese Corporation, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Emcore Corporation's Application To File Under Seal Portions Of The Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment Is Off Calendar Per The Request Of The Moving Party. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976.
    Blank 15 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Emcore Corporation's Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment Is Off Calendar Per The Request Of The Moving Party. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976.
      Blank 14 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Mini Minutes For Jun-16-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
        Blank 13 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Mini Minutes For Jun-16-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Request For Dismissal
          Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice (transaction Id # 59148704)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 11 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Emcore Corporation's Application To File Under Seal Portions Of The Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment Is Continued To June 16, 2016 At 9:30 A.m., In Dept. 302 Per The Agreement Of The Parties. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976.
              Blank 10 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Emcore Corporation's Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment Is Continued To June 16, 2016 At 9:30 A.m., In Dept. 302 Per The Agreement Of The Parties. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976.
                Blank 9 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                Mini Minutes For Jun-02-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                  Blank 8 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Mini Minutes For Jun-02-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Petitioner Emcore Corporation A New Jersey Corporation
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Declaration
                      Declaration Paul W. Moskowitz In Support Of Application To File Under Seal Portions Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment Filed By Petitioner Emcore Corporation A New Jersey Corporation
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Motion (civil Generic)
                        Application To File Under Seal Portions Of The Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment Filed By Petitioner Emcore Corporation A New Jersey Corporation Hearing Set For Jun-02-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                          Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Petitioner Emcore Corporation A New Jersey Corporation
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Declaration
                            Declaration Paul W. Moskowitz In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment/ Redacted Filed By Petitioner Emcore Corporation A New Jersey Corporation
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Motion (civil Generic)
                              Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award And For Entry Of Judgment Filed By Petitioner Emcore Corporation A New Jersey Corporation Hearing Set For Jun-02-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Emcore Corporation A New Jersey Corporation As To Respondent Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd A Japanese Corporation Sumitomo Electric Device Innovations Usa, Inc., A A Delaware Corporation Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                  Request RequestSpace

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?