Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties v. Jeffrey Wayne Smith
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515061
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry E. Hinkle +1 510 337 1001 +1 510 337 1023 bhinkle@unioncounsel.net
No Logo Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry E. Hinkle +1 510 337 1001 +1 510 337 1023 bhinkle@unioncounsel.net
No Logo Carpenters Funds Administrative Office Of Northern California, Inc., Petitioner
v.
No Logo Jeffrey Wayne Smith, Individually And Doing Business As M.d.s. Doors, Inc., Respondent
No Logo M.d.s. Doors, Inc. A California Corporation, Respondent
No Logo Smith, Jeffrey Wayne, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 Proof of Service
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 59673083), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council Served Sep-20-2016, Personal Service As To Respondent M.d.s. Doors, Inc. A California Corporation
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016 Proof of Service
    Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59650302) Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Proof of Service
      Proof Of Service Of The Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award; Memo Of P And A; Declaration Of Ezekiel D. Carder Re Attorneys' Fees In Support Of Petition; (proposed) Order Confirming Arbitration Award; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59640123) Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council As To Respondent Jeffrey Wayne Smith, Individually And Doing Business As M.d.s. Doors, Inc.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Proof of Service
        Proof Of Service Of The Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award; Memo Of P & A; Declaration Of Ezekiel D. Carder Re Attornes Fees In Support Of Petition; (proposed) Order Confirming Arbitration Award, Civil Case Sheet, Petitionto Confirm Arbitration Award. (transaction Id # 59640123) Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council As To Respondent Smith, Jeffrey Wayne
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Proof of Service
          Proof Of Service On Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59599668) Filed By Plaintiff Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Affidavit Of Due Diligence
            Affidavit Of Due Diligence (transaction Id # 59331654) Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Affidavit Of Due Diligence
              Affidavit Of Due Diligence (transaction Id # 59331654) Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Affidavit Of Due Diligence
                Affidavit Of Due Diligence (transaction Id # 59331654) Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Affidavit Of Due Diligence
                  Affidavit Of Due Diligence (transaction Id # 59331654) Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Affidavit Of Due Diligence
                    Affidavit Of Due Diligence (transaction Id # 59331654) Filed By Plaintiff Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: 6/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      Law And Motion, 302, Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Is Taken Off Calendar At The Moving Parties Request. (d302)
                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: 6/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59143552) Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: 6/14/2016
                          Declaration Of Ezekiel D. Carder Re Attorneys Fees In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration A Ward (transaction Id # 59143292) Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: 6/14/2016 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm
                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59143292) Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: 6/14/2016
                              Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59143292) Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council Hearing Set For Jul-18-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board On Behalf Of Itself And On Behalf Of Northern California Carpenters Regional Council As To Respondent Smith, Jeffrey Wayne Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                  Request RequestSpace

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?