Alameda Alliance For Health Et Al v. Rest Ez
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515063
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alameda Alliance For Health, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter M Roan +1 213 485 1500 +1 213 485 1200 proan@lockelord.com
No Logo Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter M Roan +1 213 485 1500 +1 213 485 1200 proan@lockelord.com
No Logo Alameda Alliance For Health, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter M Roan +1 213 485 1500 +1 213 485 1200 proan@lockelord.com
No Logo Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter M Roan +1 213 485 1500 +1 213 485 1200 proan@lockelord.com
v.
No Logo Rest Ez , A California Corporation, D.b.a. Rest E-z Dme, Inc., Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (8) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59700563) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Memorandum Of Costs Summary
    Memorandum Of Costs And Disbursements, $2,043.20 Total Costs, Mature Date Nov-02-2016,, (summary) (transaction Id # 59697287) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016
      Declaration Of Peter Roan In Support Of Alameda Alliance For Health And Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authoritys Motion For Attorneys Fees And Costs (transaction Id # 59697287) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016
        Motion For Attorney Fees And Expenses, Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59697287) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority Hearing Set For Nov-14-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Notice of Entry of Judgment
          Notice Of Entry Of Judgment (transaction Id # 59681827)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: 9/28/2016 Court Judgment - General
            The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority Recover From Respondent Rest Ez , A California Corporation, D.b.a. Rest E-z Dme, Inc. $277,802.79 Principal, $20,316.03 Interest, Total Judgment $298,118.82, Attorney's Fees And Costs Are Subject To A Noticed Motion. See Scanned Doc
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 18 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Law And Motion 302, Petitioners Alameda Alliance For Health And Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority's Petition To Confirm Final Arbitration Award Is Granted. Order Signed. Judge: Richard Ulmer, Clerk: E. Larnauti, Reporter: Reyes F. Hunter, Csr 6576
                Blank 17 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
                Mini Minutes For Aug-19-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Notice of Entry of Order
                  Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Confirming Final Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59447582) Filed By Plaintiff Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016
                    Order Confirming Final Arbitration Award
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016 Proof of Service
                      Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59318249) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 13 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59318249) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016
                          Declaration Of Peter Roan In Support Of Alameda Alliance For Health And Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authoritys Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59318249) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016
                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59318249) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016
                              Notice Of Petition To Confirm Final Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59318249) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority Hearing Set For Aug-19-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 9 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/20/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Law And Motion 302, Petitioners Alameda Alliance For Health, Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority's Petition To Confirm Final Arbitration Award Is Off Calendar Without Prejudice To Refile Motion Or Ex Parte Application. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Reyes F. Hunter, Csr #6576, Bus. Tel: 530-339-5023. (d302)
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/20/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                  Mini Minutes For Jul-20-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                    Law And Motion 302, Petitioners Alameda Alliance For Health And Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority's Petition To Confirm Final Arbitration A Ward Is Off Calendar At The Moving Parties' Request. =(302/hk)
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/22/2016
                                      Notice Of New Hearing Date Of Petition To Confirm Final Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59180362) Filed By Plaintiff Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority Hearing Set For Jul-20-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59118012) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016
                                          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59118012) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016
                                            Declaration Of Peter Roan In Support Of Alameda Alliance For Health And Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authoritys Petition To Confirm Arbitration A Ward (transaction Id # 59118012) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016
                                              Notice Of Petition To Confirm Final Arbitration A Ward (transaction Id # 59118012) Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority Hearing Set For Jun-29-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Alameda Alliance For Health Alameda Alliance Joint Powers Authority As To Respondent Rest Ez , A California Corporation, D.b.a. Rest E-z Dme, Inc. Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                                  Request RequestSpace

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?