V. John Threlkeld v. First Allied Securities, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515069
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Threlkeld, V. John, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Barr & Young

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon Craig Young +1 415 398 6000 gordon.young@kyl.com
v.
No Logo First Allied Securities Inc.,, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: 7/19/2016 Proof of Service
Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 100000258) Filed By Petitioner Threlkeld, V. John
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 12 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Law And Motion 302, Petitioner V. John Threlkeld's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Enter Judgment Thereon Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. Written Order And Judgment Are Signed And Filed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Laura Martinez, Csr #11332, Bus. Tel: 415-551-3745. (d302)
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Text Judgment
      The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: - Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 10 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Mini Minutes For Jul-14-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016
          Order Granting Petitioner's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016
            Declaration Of Respondents Counsel Re: Non-opposition To Petitioners Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 100022638) Filed By Petitioner Threlkeld, V. John
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt Civil
              Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt, Signed Jun-09-2016, Served Jun-03-2016 (transaction Id # 16172052) Filed By Petitioner Threlkeld, V. John As To Respondent First Allied Securities, Inc.
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: 6/6/2016 Proof of Service
                Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 16157056) Filed By Petitioner Threlkeld, V. John
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 5 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 100020502) Filed By Petitioner Threlkeld, V. John
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016
                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Enter Judgment Thereon (transaction Id # 100020502) Filed By Petitioner Threlkeld, V. John
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016
                      Declaration Of David Monsour In Support Of Petitioners Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Enter Judgment Thereon (transaction Id # 100020502) Filed By Petitioner Threlkeld, V. John
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: 6/2/2016
                        Notice Of Hearing On Petitioner V John Threlkelds Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Enter Judgment Thereon (transaction Id # 100020502) Filed By Petitioner Threlkeld, V. John Hearing Set For Jul-14-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                          Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Threlkeld, V. John As To Respondent First Allied Securities, Inc. Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                            Request RequestSpace

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 119 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?