Broadcast Music Inc. v. Golden State Broadcasting Llc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515070
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Broadcast Music, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Timothy Carl Aires

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Carl Aires , +1 949 718 2020 +1 949 718 2021 tca@arlawyers.com
v.
No Logo Golden State Broadcasting Llc, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Raines Feldman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miles J. Feldman +1 310 440 4100
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Broadcast Music Inc's Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award As Judgment Continued From Oct-26-2016 To Nov-14-2016, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Per Ex Parte Order Filed On 10/7/16
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016
    Order (re: Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016
      Ex Parte Application For Order (1) To Further Continue The Petition Response Date; (2) To Continue The Petition Reply Date And (3) To Continue The Petition Hearing Date - Stipulated (transaction Id # 16279049) Filed By Respondent Golden State Broadcasting Llc
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 12 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Broadcast Music Inc.'s Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award As Judgment Is Continued From October 12, 2016 To October 26, 2016 At 9:30 A.m., In Dept. 302 Pursuant To The Ex Parte Order Filed September 22, 2016. (302)
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016
          Order - Joint Stipulation And Order Re: Ex Parte Application (1) To Continue The Petition Response Date; (2) To Continue The Petition Reply Date; And (3) To Continue The Petition Hearing Date
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016
            Declaration Of Miles Feldman In Support Of The Joint Stipulation And Ex Parte Application (transaction Id # 16264086) Filed By Respondent Golden State Broadcasting Llc
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 9 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
              **fee Paid** Stipulation And Ex Parte Application (1) To Continue Petition Response Date; (2) To Continue The Petition Reply Date; And (3) To Continue Petition Hearing Date (transaction Id # 16264086) Filed By Respondent Golden State Broadcasting Llc
                Blank 8 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Broadcast Music Inc.'s Hearing On Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award As Judgment Is Continued From September 9, 2016 To October 12, 2016 At 9:30 Am In Department 302 For Arguments. No Notice Of Contesting Received. Defendant's Counsel Contests Client Was Properly Served. Opposition By Golden State Broadcasting To Be Filed No Later Than September 23, 2016. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Sherry L. Sawyer, Csr #59761, Email: Ssawyer@sftc.org. (d302)
                  Blank 7 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Mini Minutes For Sep-09-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: 9/1/2016 Proof of Service
                    Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 100002550), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Petitioner Broadcast Music Inc. Served Aug-12-2016, Substitute Service On Corporation As To Respondent Golden State Broadcasting Llc Dba Krev-fm
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 100022927) Filed By Petitioner Broadcast Music Inc.
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016
                        Declaration Of Timothy Carl Aires In Support Of Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award As Judgment (transaction Id # 100022927) Filed By Petitioner Broadcast Music Inc.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm
                          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award As Judgment (transaction Id # 100022927) Filed By Petitioner Broadcast Music Inc.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016
                            Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award As Judgment (transaction Id # 100022927) Filed By Petitioner Broadcast Music Inc. Hearing Set For Sep-09-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: 6/3/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                              Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Broadcast Music Inc. As To Respondent Golden State Broadcasting Llc Dba Krev-fm Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                Request RequestSpace

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?