In Re: Danielle Galicia
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515081
Judge Joseph M. Quinn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Galicia, Danilo, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of John C. Ye, Aplc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ye, John C. +1 213 427 2826
No Logo Galicia, Danielle, Claimant
Cause of Action Petition For Compromise Of Claim
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
Uncontested Calendar Of Sep-13-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Continued To Oct-20-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514 For Guardian Ad Litem Order. (514)
    Blank 6 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
    Fee Paid For Application And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (transaction Id # 16231018) Filed By Petitioner Galicia, Danilo
      Blank 5 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Uncontested Calendar Of Aug-04-2016 Motion For Compromise Of Claim Continued To Sep-13-2016 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514 For Guardian Ad Litem Order. Alisa J. Kim, Esq., Appearing For Petitioner. Judge: Joseph M. Quinn, Clerk: A. Mok. Proceedings Reported By: Mitch Lyon, Csr#6840. (514)
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/27/2016
        Supplement To Petition To Approve Compromise Of Disputed Claim Of Minor (transaction Id # 16178014) Filed By Petitioner Galicia, Danilo
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 3 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: 6/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Petitioner Galicia, Danilo
            Blank 2 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: 6/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Motion For Compromise Of Claim Filed By Petitioner Galicia, Danilo Hearing Set For Aug-04-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: 6/6/2016
              Petition For Compromise Of Claim Of Minor Filed By Petitioner Galicia, Danilo As To Claimant Galicia, Danielle Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                Request RequestSpace

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 85 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?