William Mcdevitt v. Charles Bond
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515158
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcdevitt, William, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Charles Michael Louderback

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Michael Louderback +1 415 398 7860 +1 415 398 7863 cml@paynefears.com
v.
No Logo Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Brinegar, Matthew

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brinegar, Matthew +1 415 735 6856
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Respondent Charles Bond's Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Ccp § 1285.2 Is Continued From September 13, 2016 To December 12, 2016 At 9:30 A.m., In Dept. 302 Pursuant To The Request Of The Parties. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Not Reported. (d302)
    Blank 25 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Law And Motion 302, Petitioner William Mcdevitt's Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award Is Continued From September 13, 2016 To December 12, 2016 At 9:30 A.m., In Dept. 302 Pursuant To The Request Of The Parties. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Not Reported. (d302)
      Blank 24 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Mini Minutes For Sep-13-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
        Blank 23 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Mini Minutes For Sep-13-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Blank 22 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Parties/attorneys From Consolidated Case # Cpf-16-515158 Added To Lead Case # Cpf-16-515137 For Mailing Of Court Notices.
            Blank 21 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Law And Motion 302, Respondent Charles Bond's Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Ccp § 1285.2 Is Continued From September 7, 2016 To September 13, 2016 At 9:30 A.m., In Dept. 302 Pursuant To The Ex Parte Order Filed August 18, 2016. (302)
              Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016 Order To Consolidate Actions
              Order To Consolidate Actions Of Case(s) Cpf-16-515158 With Case Cpf-16-515137, Order Granting William Mcdevitt's Ex Parte Application For Issuance Of Order Consolidating Related Actions; All Further Entries Under Case Cpf-16-515137
                Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 Amended Proof Of Service
                Amended Proof Of Service Of Response To Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award; And Declaration (transaction Id # 100001414) Filed By Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016
                  Declaration Of Matthew A. Brinegar In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Ccp 1285.2 (transaction Id # 100001413) Filed By Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 17 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 100023243) Filed By Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016
                      Exhibits To Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Ccp ? 1285.2 (transaction Id # 100023243) Filed By Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates
                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Dismiss P
                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Dismiss (transaction Id # 100023243) Filed By Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates
                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016
                          Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Ccp ? 1285.2 (transaction Id # 100023243) Filed By Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates
                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016
                            Notice Of Hearing On Respondent?s Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Ccp ? 1285.2 (transaction Id # 100023243) Filed By Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates Hearing Set For Sep-07-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 Proof of Service
                              Proof Of Service Of Response To Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award; And Declaration (transaction Id # 100023242) Filed By Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016
                                Exhibits To Response To Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 100023242) Filed By Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016
                                  Declaration Of Matthew A. Brinegar In Response To Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 100023242) Filed By Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016
                                    Response To Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 100023242) Filed By Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 Amended Proof Of Service
                                      Amended Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59406699) Filed By Petitioner Mcdevitt, William
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59390265) Filed By Petitioner Mcdevitt, William
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016
                                          Declaration Of Charles M. Louderback In Support Of Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59390265) Filed By Petitioner Mcdevitt, William
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm
                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59390265) Filed By Petitioner Mcdevitt, William
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Proof of Service
                                              Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59390265) Filed By Petitioner Mcdevitt, William
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016
                                                Notice Of Hearing For Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59390265) Filed By Petitioner Mcdevitt, William Hearing Set For Sep-13-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                  Proof Of Service Of Summons And Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Awad, Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt (transaction Id # 59350889) Filed By Petitioner Mcdevitt, William Served Jul-27-2016, Mail And Acknowledgement, Acknowledgment Date Jul-27-2016 As To Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                    Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Mcdevitt, William As To Respondent Bond, Charles Dba Physicians Advocates Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                                      Request RequestSpace

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 225 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?