Neal Tricarico v. Luxar Portfolio, Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515162
Superior Court Judge Richard B. Ulmer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tricarico, Neal, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Vincent Tricarico

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent Tricarico +1 213 629 5700
v.
No Logo Luxar Portfolio, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices Of Gugliotta & Ponzini

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C Gugliotta +1 949 757 4146
No Logo Webb, Michael, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices Of Gugliotta & Ponzini

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C Gugliotta +1 949 757 4146
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (8) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016
Proof Of Service Of Reply In Support Of Refiled Motion To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59688553) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016
    Reply In Support Of Refiled Motion To Compel Final Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59688381) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016
      Opposition To Petitioner's Refiled Petition To Confirm Final Arbitratiion Award; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 100024051) Filed By Respondent Luxar Portfolio, Inc. Webb, Michael
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Proof Of Service By First-class Mail
        Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59593534) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 21 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59580968) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016
            Declaration Of Vincent Tricarico In Support Of Refiled Motion To Confirm Final Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59580968) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016
              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Refiled Motion To Confirm Final Arbitratio Award (transaction Id # 59580968) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016
                Notice Of Hearing On Re Filed Motion And Refiled Motion To Confirm Final Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59580968) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal Hearing Set For Oct-19-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 17 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Neal Tricarico's Petition To Confirm Final Arbitration Award Is Denied Without Prejudice To Re-filing The Motion Based On The Contention That The Issues Decided By The Arbitrator Were Subject To A Binding And Enforceable Arbitration Agreement And/or Respondents Waived Any Right They Had To Object To The Arbitrator Deciding The Issues That She Decided. Prevailing Party To Submit A [proposed] Written Order Tracking, Verbatim The Court's Ruling And In Compliance With Crc 3.1312. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Sherry L. Sawyer, Csr #59761, Email: Ssawyer@sftc.org. (d302)
                    Blank 16 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Mini Minutes For Sep-13-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016
                      Proof Of Service Re Reply (transaction Id # 59512062) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016
                        Reply In Support Of Petition To Confirm Final Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59512057) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: 9/1/2016 Opposition
                          Opposition To Petitioner's Petition To Confirm Final Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 100023430) Filed By Respondent Luxar Portfolio, Inc. Webb, Michael
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016
                            Proof Of Service Of Notice Of Hearing On Petition And Petition And Supporting Papers On Luxar Portfolio, Inc And Michael Webb (transaction Id # 59446654) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016
                              Proof Of Service Of Of Petition On Michael Webb (transaction Id # 59446654) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal Served Aug-10-2016, Personal Service As To Respondent Webb, Michael
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016
                                Proof Of Service Of Of Petition On Luxar Portfolio, Inc. (transaction Id # 59446654) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal Served Aug-10-2016, Personal Service As To Respondent Luxar Portfolio, Inc.
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Neal Tricarico's Petition To Confirm Final Arbitration Award Is Off Calendar Per The Moving Party's Request. Judge: Richard Ulmer; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Laura Martinez, Csr #11332, Bus. Tel: 415-551-3745, Email: Lmartinez@sftc.org. (d302)
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                    Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59431865) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm
                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59431865) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016
                                        Re Notice Of Hearing On Petition And Petition To Con Firm Final Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59431865) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal Hearing Set For Sep-13-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                          Mini Minutes For Aug-16-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59329211) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016
                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Hearing On Petn. To Confirm Final Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59329211) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016
                                                Notice Of Hearing On Petition And Petition To Confirm Final Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59329211) Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal Hearing Set For Aug-16-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                  Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Tricarico, Neal As To Respondent Luxar Portfolio, Inc. Webb, Michael Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                                    Request RequestSpace

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?