Francis Ng Et Al v. Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagen, Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515164
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ng, Francis Individual, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, David N.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Barry +1 310 854 4015
No Logo Ng, Helen, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, David N.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Barry +1 310 854 4015
v.
No Logo Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean P. Conboy +1 415 989 5900
No Logo Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagen, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean P. Conboy +1 415 989 5900
No Logo Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagen, A California Corporation, Respondent
No Logo Does 1 Through 20 Inclusive, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Respondent Dds Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions Is Off Calendar. A Dismissal Of The Entire Action Was Filed On September 21, 2016. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Not Reported. (d302)
    Blank 12 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
    Mini Minutes For Oct-13-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
      Blank 11 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Law And Motion, 302, Petitioners Janice Scudmore And Erik Scudmore's Petition To Compel Arbitration, Off Calendar On Oct-28-2016 Per Request Of The Moving Parties. Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed Sep-21-2016. (302)
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Request For Dismissal
        Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice (transaction Id # 16264015)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016
          Proof Of Service Re Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagens Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59541367) Filed By Respondent Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagen
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 8 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59541367) Filed By Defendant Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagen
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016
              Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagens Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59541367) Filed By Respondent Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagen
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016
                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagens Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59541367) Filed By Respondent Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagen
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016
                  Declaration Of Sean Conboy In Support Of Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagens Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59541367) Filed By Respondent Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagen
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016
                    Notice Of Motion And Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59541367) Filed By Respondent Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagen Hearing Set For Oct-13-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Notice Of Petition To Compel Arbitration
                      Notice Of Petition To Compel Arbitration (transaction Id # 16213015) Filed By Petitioner Ng, Francis Individual Ng, Helen Hearing Set For Oct-28-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 16213015) Filed By Petitioner Ng, Francis Individual Ng, Helen
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: 7/19/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                          Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Ng, Francis Individual Ng, Helen As To Respondent Dds Enterprises, Inc. Dba Sunnyvale Volkswagen, A California Corporation Does 1 Through 20 Inclusive Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                            Request RequestSpace

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 170 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?