Square, Inc. v. Michael Wein Esq
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515170
Superior Court Judge Richard B. Ulmer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Square, Inc. Square, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Bornstein +1 415 249 1000 +1 415 249 1001 jeff.bornstein@klgates.com
v.
No Logo Wein Esq, Michael (d/b/a Law Offices Of Michael Wein), Respondent
No Logo Wein, Michael, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (8) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 66 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Respondent Michael Wein's Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Further Orders And Adjudications Under Faa In Federal District Court Of Maryland Is Continued From September 22, 2016 To October 24, 2016 At 9:30 Am In Department 302. Mr. Wein May File Supplemental Papers By October 12, 2016. Square May File Response By October 18, 2016. No Further Briefing Will Be Accepted. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Sherry L. Sawyer, Csr #5976, Email: Ssawyer@sftc.org. (d302)
    Blank 65 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Square, Inc.'s Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Is Continued From September 22, 2016 To October 24, 2016 At 9:30 Am In Department 302. Mr. Wein May File Supplemental Papers By October 12, 2016. Square May File Response By October 18, 2016. No Further Briefing Will Be Accepted. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Sherry L. Sawyer, Csr #5976, Email: Ssawyer@sftc.org. (d302)
      Blank 64 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Law And Motion 302, Respondent Michael Wein's Motion To Grant Cross-petitioners Motion To Vacate, Remand And Or Modify Arbitration Award Is Continued From September 22, 2016 To October 24, 2016 At 9:30 Am In Department 302. Mr. Wein May File Supplemental Papers By October 12, 2016. Square May File Response By October 18, 2016. No Further Briefing Will Be Accepted. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Sherry L. Sawyer, Csr #5976, Email: Ssawyer@sftc.org. (d302)
        Blank 63 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Mini Minutes For Sep-22-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Blank 62 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Mini Minutes For Sep-22-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
            Blank 61 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Law And Motion 302, Duplicate Entry Of Petitioner Square, Inc.'s Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Is Deleted. (added For Posting Of Long Tentative Ruling Only) (d302/jrm)
              Blank 60 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Mini Minutes For Sep-22-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                Blank 59 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                Added To Calendar For Petitioner Square, Inc. Notice Of Motion And Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (added For Posting Of Tentative Ruling) Hearing Set For Sep-22-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Proof of Service
                  Proof Of Service (for Response) (transaction Id # 59590992) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016
                    Response To Notice Of Withdrawal Of Cross-petition To Vacate, Remand, And/or Modify Arbitration Award Without Prejudice In Favor Of Pending Federal Case And Supplement To Motion To Stay Of Proceedings On Square's Motion To Confirm (transaction Id # 59590992) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016
                      Proof Of Service By Electronic Mail Of Notice Of Withdrawal Of Cross Petition To Vacate, Remand, And/or Modify Arbitration Award Without Prejudice In Favor Of Pending Federal Case And Supplement To Motion To Stay Of Proceedings On Square's Motion To Confirm; Exhibits A-c. (transaction Id # 59589997) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016
                        Exhibits A To C (transaction Id # 59587998) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016
                          Notice Of Withdrawal Of Cross Petition To Vacate, Remand, And Or Modify Arbitration Award Without Prejudice In Favor Of Pending Federal Case And Supplement To Motion To Stay Of Proceedings On Squares Motion To Confirm (transaction Id # 59587998) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016
                            Proof Of Service Of Reply (transaction Id # 59510883) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016
                              Reply To Petitioner Square Response To Weins (emergency) Request For Continuance Of Hearing And That All Pending Motions Be Heard Together On November 10, 2016 (refiled From 8 29 2016) (transaction Id # 59510883) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 51 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Law And Motion 302, Respondent Michael Wein's Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Further Orders And Adjudications Under Faa In Federal District Court Of Maryland Is Continued To Be Heard On September 22, 2016 At 9:30 A.m., In Dept. 302, With Respondent's Motion To Vacate, Remand, Or Modify The Arbitration Award (see Mini-minutes For Details). Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Reporter: Reyes Hunter, Csr # 6576 =302/hk
                                  Blank 50 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Square, Inc.'s Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Is Continued To Be Heard On September 22, 2016 At 9:30 A.m., In Dept. 302, With Respondent's Motion To Vacate, Remand, Or Modify The Arbitration Award (see Mini-minutes For Details). Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Reporter: Reyes Hunter, Csr # 6576 =302/hk
                                    Blank 49 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Law And Motion, 302, Respondent Michael Wein Notice Of Motion And Motion To Grant Cross Petitioners Motion To Vacate, Remand And Or Modify Arbitration Award Is Advanced To September 22, 2016 Per Order Of The Judge In Open Court On August 30, 2016
                                      Blank 48 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                      Mini Minutes For Aug-30-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                        Blank 47 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                        Mini Minutes For Aug-30-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Proof of Service
                                          Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59481031) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016
                                            Exhibits Ad To Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Square Incs Response To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Emergency Request For Continuance Of Hearing And That All Pending Motions Be Heard Together On November 10 2016 Or A Mutually Agreed Upon Date Thereafter (transaction Id # 59480850) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016
                                              Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Square Incs Response To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Emergency Request For Continuance Of Hearing And That All Pending Motions Be Heard Together On November 10 2016 Or A Mutually Agreed Upon Date Thereafter (transaction Id # 59480850) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016
                                                Response To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Emergency Request For Continuance Of Hearing And That All Pending Motions Be Heard Together On November 10 2016 Or A Mutually Agreed Upon Date Thereafter (transaction Id # 59480850) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016
                                                  Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins (emergency) Request For Continuance Of Hearing And That All Pending Motions Be Heard Together On November 10, 2016, Or A Mutually Agreed Upon Date Thereafter (transaction Id # 59477526) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Proof Of Electronic Service
                                                    Proof Of Electronic Service (transaction Id # 59463900) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                      Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59463900) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016
                                                        Notice Of Motion And Motion To Grant Cross Petitioners Motion To Vacate, Remand And Or Modify Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59463900) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael Hearing Set For Nov-10-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: 8/23/2016 Proof of Service
                                                          Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59461905) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: 8/23/2016
                                                            Exhibits Ab To Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Reply In Support Of Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Opposition To Cross Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59461905) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: 8/23/2016
                                                              Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Reply In Support Of Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Opposition To Cross Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59461905) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: 8/23/2016
                                                                Reply In Support Of Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Opposition To Cross Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59461905) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016 Proof of Service
                                                                  Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59443552) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016
                                                                    Exhibits C I To Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Petitioner Square Incs Opposition To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Further Orders And Adjudications Under Faa In Federal District Court Of Maryland (transaction Id # 59443552) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016
                                                                      Exhibit B To Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Petitioner Square Incs Opposition To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Further Orders And Adjudications Under Faa In Federal District Court Of Maryland (transaction Id # 59443552) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016
                                                                        Exhibit A To Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Petitioner Square Incs Opposition To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Further Orders And Adjudications Under Faa In Federal District Court Of Maryland (transaction Id # 59443552) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016
                                                                          Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Petitioner Square Incs Opposition To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Further Orders And Adjudications Under Faa In Federal District Court Of Maryland (transaction Id # 59443552) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016
                                                                            Opposition To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Further Orders And Adjudications Under Faa In Federal District Court Of Maryland (transaction Id # 59443552) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              Law And Motion 302, Respondent Michael Wein's Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Further Orders And Adjudications Under Faa In Federal District Court Of Maryland Is Continued From August 16, 2016 To August 30, 2016 At 9:30 A.m., In Dept. 302 To Be Heard With The Petition To Confirm Award. Mr. Wein Is Ordered To Comply With Sf Local Rule 2.7b By Delivering Courtesy Copies Of His Filings To Department 302 With A Cover Letter Reflecting The New Hearing Date. Judge: Richard Ulmer; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Laura Martinez, Csr #11332, Bus. Tel: 415-551-3745, Email: Lmartinez@sftc.org. (d302)
                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Mini Minutes For Aug-16-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016
                                                                                  Exhibit E (part 3 Of 3) Of Bates Stamped Arbitration Filings For Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion And Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Vacate, Remand And Or Modify Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59421069) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016
                                                                                    Exhibit E (part 2 Of 3) Of Bates Stamped Arbitration Filings For Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion And Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Vacate, Remand And Or Modify Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59421069) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016
                                                                                      Exhibit E (part 1 Of 3) Of Bates Stamped Arbitration Filings For Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion And Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Vacate, Remand And Or Modify Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59421069) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016
                                                                                        Exhibits A F To Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Petitioner Square Incs Opposition To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion For Stay Of Proceedings And Request For Continuance Of Hearing And That All Pending Motions Be Heard Together (transaction Id # 59420151) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 Proof of Service
                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Opposition To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion For Stay Of Proceedings And Request For Continuance Of Hearing And That All Pending Motions Be Heard Together; Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Petitioner Square Incs Opposition To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion For Stay Of Proceedings And Request For Continuance Of Hearing And That All Pending Motions Be Heard Together; Exhibits A-f To Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Petitioner Square Incs Opposition To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion For Stay Of Proceedings And Request (transaction Id # 59420151) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016
                                                                                            Declaration Of Benjamin Bien Kahn In Support Of Petitioner Square Incs Opposition To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion For Stay Of Proceedings And Request For Continuance Of Hearing And That All Pending Motions Be Heard Together (transaction Id # 59420151) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016
                                                                                              Opposition To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion For Stay Of Proceedings And Request For Continuance Of Hearing And That All Pending Motions Be Heard Together (transaction Id # 59420151) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016
                                                                                                Exhibits A To D To Respondent Cross Petitioner Weins Motion And Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Vacate, Remand And Or Modify Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59400009) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Notice of Unavailability
                                                                                                  Notice Of Unavailability Of Pro Per On Aug-24-2016 Through Aug-31-2016 (transaction Id # 59393105) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Proof of Service
                                                                                                    Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59387638) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016
                                                                                                      Proof Of Service (motion To Stay And Related Filings) (transaction Id # 59382068) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59382068) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016
                                                                                                          Exhibit "a" Copy Of E-filed Federal Motion And Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Vacate, Remand And Or Modify Arbitration Award By Wein (transaction Id # 59382068) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016
                                                                                                            Refiled Proof Of Service (respondent Cross-petitioner Weins Motion And Memorandum Of Points In Support Of Cross-petition To Vacate, Remand And Or Modify Arbitration Award) (transaction Id # 59382068) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016
                                                                                                              Proof Of Service On Cross-petition And Answer (8.1.2016) (transaction Id # 59382068) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016
                                                                                                                Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Further Orders And Adjudications Under Faa In Federal District Court Of Maryland (transaction Id # 59382068) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael Hearing Set For Aug-16-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016
                                                                                                                  Motion And Memorandum Of Points In Support Of Cross-petition To Vacate, Remand And Or Modify Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59382068) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Civil Cover Sheet; Petition To Confirm Contratual Arbitration Award; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award; Declaration Of Ross W Nadel In Support Of Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award; Proposed Order (transaction Id # 59353233) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016
                                                                                                                      Petition To Correct Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59351634) Filed By Respondent Wein, Michael
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59325711) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016
                                                                                                                          Exhibits D-e To Declaration Of Ross W Nadel In Support Of Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59325711) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016
                                                                                                                            Exhibits A C To Declaration Of Ross W Nadel In Support Of Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59325711) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016
                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Ross W Nadel In Support Of Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59325711) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016
                                                                                                                                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59325711) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc.
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016
                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Motion And Motion To Grant Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59325711) Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc. Hearing Set For Aug-30-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: 7/21/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                                                                                                                                    Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Square, Inc. As To Respondent Wein Esq, Michael (d/b/a Law Offices Of Michael Wein) Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 217 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?