Rosalie Griesshaber Et Al v. Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515171
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Griesshaber, Paul An Individual, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, David N.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Barry +1 310 854 4015
No Logo Griesshaber, Rosalie An Individual, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, David N.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Barry +1 310 854 4015
v.
No Logo Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen, A California Corporation, Respondent
No Logo Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc.dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean P. Conboy +1 415 989 5900
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc.'s Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions Is Off Calendar. The Case Was Dismissed On September 13, 2016. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Not Reported. (d302)
    Blank 14 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
    Mini Minutes For Oct-11-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
      Blank 13 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Law And Motion, 302, Petitioners Rosalie Griesshaber And Paul Griesshaber's Petition To Compel Arbitration, Off Calendar On Oct-28-2016 Per Request Of The Moving Parties. Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed Sep-13-2016. (302)
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Request For Dismissal
        Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice (transaction Id # 16255054)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Invalid Check Order
          Civil Complaint/petition/other First Paper Stricken By Court Order For Failure To Redeem Invalid Check For Transaction W0916722f001; No Further Filings On Part Of Griesshaber, Rosalie An Individual Griesshaber, Paul An Individual
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 10 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59540664) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc.dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016
              Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59540664) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc.dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016
                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59540664) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc.dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016
                  Proof Of Service Re Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59540664) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc.dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016
                    Declaration Of Sean Conboy In Support Of Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59540664) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc.dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016
                      Notice Of Motion And Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59540664) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc.dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen Hearing Set For Oct-11-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Invalid Check Notice
                        Invalid/returned Check For Transaction W0916722f001 For Civil Complaint/petition/other First Paper
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Notice Of Petition To Compel Arbitration
                          Notice Of Petition To Compel Arbitration (transaction Id # 16213020) Filed By Petitioner Griesshaber, Rosalie An Individual Griesshaber, Paul An Individual Hearing Set For Oct-28-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 16213020) Filed By Petitioner Griesshaber, Rosalie An Individual Griesshaber, Paul An Individual
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                              Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Griesshaber, Rosalie An Individual Griesshaber, Paul An Individual As To Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen, A California Corporation Does 1 To 20, Inclusive Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                Request RequestSpace

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?