Taner Pamuk Et Al v. M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkwagen Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515172
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hartmann, Sarah D. An Individual, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, David N.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Barry +1 310 854 4015
No Logo Pamuk, Taner An Individual, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, David N.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Barry +1 310 854 4015
v.
No Logo M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkswagen Of Oakland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean P. Conboy +1 415 989 5900
No Logo Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive, Respondent
No Logo M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkswagen Of Oakland, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean P. Conboy +1 415 989 5900
No Logo M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkwagen Of Oakland, A California Corporation, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
Invalid/returned Check Redeemed For Transaction W1016722f001 For Civil Complaint/petition/other First Paper
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
    Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Volkswagen Of Oaklands Opposition To Petition To Compel Arbitration Pursuant To Cal Code Of Civil Procedure 12812 (transaction Id # 59534686) Filed By Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkswagen Of Oakland
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
      Opposition To Petition To Compel Arbitration Pursuant To Cal Code Of Civil Procedure 12812 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 59534686) Filed By Defendant M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkswagen Of Oakland
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
        Notice Of Lodgment Of Compendium Of Non California Authorities In Support Of Volkswagen Of Oaklands Opposition To Petition To Compel Arbitration Pursuant To Cal Code Of Civil Procedure 12812 (transaction Id # 59534686) Filed By Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkswagen Of Oakland
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
          Evidentiary Objections In Opposition To Petition To Compel Arbitration Pursuant To Cal. Code Of Civil Procedure 12812 (transaction Id # 59534686) Filed By Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkswagen Of Oakland
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
            Declaration Of Sean P Conboy In Support Of Volkswagen Of Oakland's Opposition To Petition To Compel Arbitration Pursuant To Cal Code Of Civil Procedure 12812 (transaction Id # 59534686) Filed By Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkswagen Of Oakland
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Invalid Check Notice
              Invalid/returned Check For Transaction W1016722f001 For Civil Complaint/petition/other First Paper
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Notice Of Petition To Compel Arbitration
                Notice Of Petition To Compel Arbitration, Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 16213055) Filed By Petitioner Pamuk, Taner An Individual Hartmann, Sarah D. An Individual Hearing Set For Oct-28-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 16213055) Filed By Petitioner Pamuk, Taner An Individual Hartmann, Sarah D. An Individual
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                    Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Pamuk, Taner An Individual Hartmann, Sarah D. An Individual As To Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkwagen Of Oakland, A California Corporation Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                      Request RequestSpace

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 91 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?