Janice Scudmore Et Al v. Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515173
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Scudmore, Erik An Individual, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, David N.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Barry +1 310 854 4015
No Logo Scudmore, Janice An Individual, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, David N.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Barry +1 310 854 4015
v.
No Logo Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen, A California Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean P. Conboy +1 415 989 5900
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc's Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions Is Off Calendar. The Case Was Dismissed On September 9, 2016. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Not Reported. (d302)
    Blank 13 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
    Mini Minutes For Oct-11-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
      Blank 12 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Law And Motion, 302, Petitioners Janice Scudmore And Erik Scudmore's Petition To Compel Arbitration, Off Calendar On Oct-28-2016 Per Request Of Moving Party. Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed Sep-09-2016. (302)
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Request For Dismissal
        Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice (transaction Id # 16252041)
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
          Proof Of Service Re Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59536228) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen, A California Corporation
            Blank 9 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59536228) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen, A California Corporation
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
              Declaration Of Sean Conboy In Support Of Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59536228) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen, A California Corporation
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
                Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion For And Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59536228) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen, A California Corporation
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
                  Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For And Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59536228) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen, A California Corporation
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
                    Notice Of Motion And Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59536228) Filed By Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen, A California Corporation Hearing Set For Oct-11-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Invalid Check Notice
                      Invalid/returned Check For Transaction W0916722f002 For Civil Complaint/petition/other First Paper
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Notice Of Petition To Compel Arbitration
                        Notice Of Petition To Compel Arbitration (transaction Id # 16213018) Filed By Petitioner Scudmore, Janice An Individual Scudmore, Erik An Individual Hearing Set For Oct-28-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                          Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 16213018) Filed By Petitioner Scudmore, Janice An Individual Scudmore, Erik An Individual
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                            Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Scudmore, Janice An Individual Scudmore, Erik An Individual As To Respondent Dirito Brothers Walnut Creek, Inc. Dba Dirito Brothers Volkswagen, A California Corporation Does 1 To 20, Inclusive Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 148 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?