Ira Jacobowitz Et Al v. M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkwagen Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515174
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jacobowitz, Ira An Individual, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, David N.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Barry +1 310 854 4015
No Logo Jacobowitz, Leslie An Individual, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, David N.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Barry +1 310 854 4015
v.
No Logo Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive, Respondent
No Logo M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkwagen Of Oakland, A California Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean P. Conboy +1 415 989 5900
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc.'s Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue And Request For Monetary Sanctions Is Off Calendar. A Dismissal Of The Entire Action Was Filed On September 21, 2016. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Reporter: Not Reported. (d302)
    Blank 12 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
    Mini Minutes For Oct-13-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
      Blank 11 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Law And Motion, 302, Petitioners Ira Jacobowitz And Leslie Jacobowitz's Petition To Compel Arbitration, Off Calendar On Oct-28-2016 Per Request Of The Moving Parties. Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed Sep-21-2016. (302)
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Request For Dismissal
        Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice (transaction Id # 16264016)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
          Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of M M Automotive Group Inc Dba Volkswagen Of Oaklands Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue, And Request For Monet Ary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59536409) Filed By Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkwagen Of Oakland, A California Corporation
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of M M Automotive Group Inc Dba Volkswagen Of Oaklands Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue And Request For Monet Ary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59536409) Filed By Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkwagen Of Oakland, A California Corporation
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
              Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue And Request For Monet Ary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59536409) Filed By Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkwagen Of Oakland, A California Corporation Hearing Set For Oct-13-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 6 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 59536409) Filed By Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkwagen Of Oakland, A California Corporation
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: 9/8/2016
                  Declaration Of Sean Conboy In Support Of M M Automotive Group Inc Dba Volkswagen Of Oaklands Motion For An Order Transferring The Action To The Proper Venue And Request For Monetary Sanctions (transaction Id # 59536409) Filed By Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkwagen Of Oakland, A California Corporation
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Invalid Check Notice
                    Invalid/returned Check For Transaction W1016722f003 For Civil Complaint/petition/other First Paper
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Notice Of Petition To Compel Arbitration
                      Notice Of Petition To Compel Arbitration (transaction Id # 16213014) Filed By Petitioner Jacobowitz, Ira An Individual Jacobowitz, Leslie An Individual Hearing Set For Oct-28-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 16213014) Filed By Petitioner Jacobowitz, Ira An Individual Jacobowitz, Leslie An Individual
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                          Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Jacobowitz, Ira An Individual Jacobowitz, Leslie An Individual As To Respondent M&m Automotive Group, Inc. Dba Volkwagen Of Oakland, A California Corporation Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                            Request RequestSpace

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 199 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?